Esmeralda Revuelta v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Revuelta
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv03919
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On June 15, 2021, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on June 17, 2021. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Colbert, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 6/29/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) response. If plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) files: An answer by the defendant(s); Plaintiff(s) application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to the defendant(s); on or before the date indicated above, the Court will consider this a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah A Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff Esmeralda Revuelta (Attorney Sarah A Wilson added to party Esmeralda Revuelta(pty:pla))(Wilson, Sarah)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Colbert, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of State Court File re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Colbert, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Colbert, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV33577 Receipt No: ACACDC-31263770 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Declaration of Michael F. Colbert, Esq.) (Attorney Michael Colbert added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Colbert, Michael)
May 10, 2021 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Walmart Inc., Does 1-25, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Esmeralda Revuelta. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/2/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esmeralda Revuelta v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Michael Colbert
Represented By: Bron E D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Revuelta
Represented By: Daniel Azizi
Represented By: Sarah A Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?