Safety PPE, LLC v. Skanda Group of Industries LLC et al
Plaintiff: Safety PPE, LLC
Defendant: Skanda Group of Industries LLC and Nagendra Karri
Case Number: 2:2021cv03967
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION OF CHANGE OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL changing lead counsel from Jeremy T. Elman to Matthew P. Lewis. filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC, (Lewis, Matthew)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC. (Lewis, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 9, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 26, 2021. (iv)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Jeffrey C.P. Wang to Kathleen E. Alparce. filed by Defendants Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group of Industries LLC, (Wang, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group of Industries LLC identifying (none) as Corporate Parent. (Wang, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group of Industries LLC, identifying Defendant Skanda Group of Industries LLC, Nagendra Karri, member of Defendant Skanda Group of Industries LLC, Chetna Jhamb, member of Defendant Skanda Group of Industries LLC, and Nagendra Karri, Defendant as an individual. (Wang, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group of Industries LLC.(Attorney Jeffrey C P Wang added to party Nagendra Karri(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey C P Wang added to party Skanda Group of Industries LLC(pty:dft))(Wang, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC, upon Defendant Skanda Group of Industries LLC served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Wang, Attorney for Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to 5d- Email to Jeffrey Wang Regarding Service of Docs-Skanda, #2 Attachment 2 to 5d-Declaration of Due Diligence for Service on Skanda Group of Industries)(Lewis, Matthew)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC, upon Defendant Nagendra Karri served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Wang, Attorney for Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to 5d- Email to Jeffrey Wang Regarding Service of Docs-Nagendra Karri, #2 Attachment 2 to 5d- Declaration of Due Diligence for Service on Nagendra Karri)(Lewis, Matthew)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Jeremy T. Elman as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC. (Elman, Jeremy)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Nagendra Karri, Skanda Group of Industries LLC. (esa)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC. (Lewis, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC, (Lewis, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC. (Lewis, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31275894 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Safety PPE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Matthew P. Lewis added to party Safety PPE, LLC(pty:pla))(Lewis, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safety PPE, LLC v. Skanda Group of Industries LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skanda Group of Industries LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Alparce Vasquez
Represented By: Jeffrey C P Wang
Represented By: Jessica Ann Crabbe
Represented By: Michael G York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagendra Karri
Represented By: Kathleen Alparce Vasquez
Represented By: Jeffrey C P Wang
Represented By: Jessica Ann Crabbe
Represented By: Michael G York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety PPE, LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Lewis
Represented By: Jeremy T. Elman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?