Francisco Enriquez v. Gene Dodaro et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Enriquez
Defendant: Gene Dodaro and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv04009
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Enriquez All Plaintiffs, identifying Francisco Enriquez. (Johnson, A Melissa)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court issued its May 13, 2021 Order to Show Cause regarding supplemental jurisdiction in error. The Court vacates the Order to Show Cause. (mrgo)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of and alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. 12010-12213, and a claim for damages pursuant to California's Unruh Civil Rights Act ("Unruh Act"), Cal. Civ. Code 51-53. It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, and any other state law claim that plaintiff may have alleged, pursuant to the Court's supplemental jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(a). Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than May 27, 2021. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jgr)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Gene Dodaro. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Unredacted Document Civil Cover Sheet and No. 2 Summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect initiating event was selected for Document No. 1. The correct initiating event is Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening). You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed as PETITION Enriquez Receipt No: ACACDC-31285837 - Fee: $402, filed by Enriquez Francisco Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Attorney A Melissa Johnson added to party Francisco Enriquez(pty:pla))(Johnson, A Melissa) Modified on 5/13/2021 (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco Enriquez v. Gene Dodaro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Dodaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Enriquez
Represented By: A Melissa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?