Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker v. Red Bull North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nelson Daniel Bunker, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker and Nelson Daniel Farr
Defendant: Red Bull North America and Red Bull North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04040
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING JULY 19, 2021 HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #8 and PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #13 TO JULY 26, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The July 19, 2021 hearing for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is continued to July 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The continuance does not extend the time for filing and serving opposing papers (which were filed on June 28, 2021). The continuance does extend the time for filing and serving reply papers to July 12, 2021. (iv)
June 28, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 in support of Red Bull's Opposition filed by Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Williams, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Williams, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to to Dismiss #8 filed by Plaintiffs Nelson Daniel Farr, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker. (Silberfeld, Roman)
June 28, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue Hearings for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from July 19, 2021 to July 26, 2021 Re: to Dismiss #8 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 14 filed by Plaintiffs Nelson Daniel Farr, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silberfeld, Roman)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Court hereby orders that the request of Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc. to substitute Michael E. Williams as attorney of record instead of Gary L. Montanari and Wesley S. Wenig is GRANTED. (et)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant RED BULL NORTH AMERICA, INC.'s unopposed application to file under seal is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael E. Williams in place of attorney Garry L. Montanari filed by defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael E Williams added to party Red Bull North America, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Williams, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 is continued to July 19, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Nelson Daniel Farr, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Zac Cohen, #3 Proposed Order) (Silberfeld, Roman)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Motion to Dismiss #8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is accepted as filed. The docket clerk is requested to update the docket entry to reflect the correct filing event, and date and time of the hearing. (iv)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Motions. Because the incorrect event was used, the hearing information was not entered on the docket. Counsel should utilize the "Search" feature in CM/ECF to ascertain the correct filing event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #9 filed by Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document)(Montanari, Garry)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Application to File Under Seal)(Montanari, Garry)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed as] MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Montanari, Garry) Modified on 6/4/2021 (iv). Motion set for hearing 7/19/21 at 10:00 am.
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Nelson Daniel Farr, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker.. (Silberfeld, Roman)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by defendant Red Bull North America, Inc..(Montanari, Garry)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
May 13, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Red Bull North America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Nelson Daniel Farr, Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/30/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Notice of Filing Defendant's Notice of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, #2 Declaration Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court)(Montanari, Garry)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV12165 Receipt No: ACACDC-31292406 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Red Bull North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Garry L Montanari added to party Red Bull North America(pty:dft))(Montanari, Garry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker v. Red Bull North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Daniel Bunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Daniel Farr Bunker
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Zachary A Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Daniel Farr
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Represented By: Zachary A Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Bull North America
Represented By: Garry L Montanari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Bull North America, Inc.
Represented By: Garry L Montanari
Represented By: Michael E Williams
Represented By: Wesley S Wenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?