Colby Watson v. Goop, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colby Watson
Defendant: Goop, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04113
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Colby Watson, designating James R Noblin as local counsel. (lom)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Green, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #14 RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney #13 , by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 13 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #14 filed on May 27, 2021. (bm)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Colby Watson, upon Defendant Goop, Inc. served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mike Doe, Person In Charge of Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Robert)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 6/1/2021. Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Green, Robert) Modified on 6/1/2021 (bm).
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) #9 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 9 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #11 filed on May 20, 2021. (mrgo)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). Failed to list OK, NY & TX or provide GSC for each. (lt)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 12] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Colby Watson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31314777) filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Green, Robert) Modified on 5/24/2021 (mrgo).
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Goop, Inc. (ghap)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson, (Green, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson. (Green, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31309050 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Colby Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Robert S. Green added to party Colby Watson(pty:pla))(Green, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colby Watson v. Goop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Watson
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Robert S Green
Represented By: Emrah M Sumer
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Represented By: William B. Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?