Benjamin Wizmann et al v. Alana Yakovlev et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wizmann and Michelle Wizman
Defendant: Alana Yakovlev and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv04244
Filed: May 20, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #33 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action, in its entirety, be dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
September 3, 2021 Filing 33 REQUEST to Dismiss Case JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wizmann. (Lubin, Lee)
July 16, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barry Z Brodsky counsel for Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Adding Rosely George as counsel of record for Defendant Alana Yakovlev for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. (Brodsky, Barry)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #29 , the Court orders that all proceedings in this action are stayed pending the parties' 9/30/2021 mediation. The parties shall mutually exchange documents through informal discovery by no later than 7/30/2021. All dates currently scheduled in this action are vacated, including the 8/20/2021 scheduling conference. The parties shall file a joint status report by no later than 10/11/2021. (gk)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Substitution of Attorney Barry Brodsky for Defendant Alana Yakovlev in place of Attorneys Steven R. Yee and Karlfeldt Su. (gk)
July 12, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending mediation filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brodsky, Barry)
July 9, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Alana Yakovlev re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #27 (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Brodsky, Barry)
July 7, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Defendant's Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed 7/1/2021 #25 . The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 7/9/2021. (gk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging, Local Rule 5-4.4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 1, 2021 Filing 25 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS ON 7/7/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 27] defendant - substitution of attorney (Su, Karlfeldt) Modified on 7/8/2021 (gk).
May 25, 2021 Filing 24 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Wizman, Benjamin Wizmann.. (Lubin, Lee)
May 25, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Lubin, Lee)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karlfeldt Su on behalf of Defendant Alana Yakovlev (Su, Karlfeldt)
May 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev, (Sorkin, William)
May 21, 2021 Filing 18 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. (Sorkin, William)
May 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
May 20, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT L)(ghap)
May 20, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Alana Yakovlev., filed by plaintiffs Benjamin Wizmann, Michelle Wizman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Notice of Case Reassignment as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Answer as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Peremptory Challenge as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Notice of Continuance of OSC and Case Management Conference as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Order to Show Cause Hearing as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Notice of Case Management Conference as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stips and ADR Info Package as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court First Amended General Order as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Plaintiffs' Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Plaintiffs' Civil Case Cover Sheet as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Plaintiffs' Summons as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. State Court Notice of Case Assignment as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Alana Yakovlev. Plaintiffs' Complaint as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sorkin, William)
May 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV44911 Receipt No: ACACDC-31333695 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Alana Yakovlev. (Attorney William Geoffrey Sorkin added to party Alana Yakovlev(pty:dft))(Sorkin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Wizmann et al v. Alana Yakovlev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wizmann
Represented By: Lee David Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Wizman
Represented By: Lee David Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alana Yakovlev
Represented By: William Geoffrey Sorkin
Represented By: Barry Z Brodsky
Represented By: Rosely George
Represented By: Steven R Yee
Represented By: Karlfeldt Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?