Ronald P. Slates v. Adama Technologies Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ronald P. Slates
Defendant: International Ambitions, LLC, Adama Technologies Corporation, JA Investment Holdings, LLC, Erik Durrant, Harold Tanner, Rowen Pfeifer, Alpine Industries, LLC, Eric Sills and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv04496
Filed: May 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #22 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Harold Tanner, Eric Sills, Alpine Industries, LLC, and Erik Durrant have until September 30, 2021 to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint and to comply with the requirements of Rule 26; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that as due consideration for the foregoing extensions of time, Harold Tanner, Eric Sills, Alpine Industries, LLC, and Erik Durrant have agreed to participate in mediation on September 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before the Hon. Charles "Skip" Rubin, Judge (Ret.), in the hopes of amicably resolving the within matter without the need for protracted litigation. (mrgo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/30/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trope, Konrad)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On June 29, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in his first case. The Court finds Plaintiff's dismissal of his first case is sufficient to discharge the Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court hereby discharges its June 3, 2021 Orders to Show Cause. (iv)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: the Court declines Plaintiffs "request" to consolidate the two cases. "Requests" are not authorized by either the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Central District of California or by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court gives Plaintiff until Friday, July 2, 2021 to dismiss Plaintiff's first case (Ronald P. Slates v. Adama Technologies Corporation, et al., CV 21-01650) or dismiss this current case. If Plaintiff does not dismiss the first case or this case by July 2, 2021, the Court will dismiss this case and allow Plaintiff to proceed with his first case. (See document for full details) (mrgo)
June 24, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Lodging, #17 by Clerk of Court. Document submitted in the wrong case. The document is stricken. (mrgo)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Lodging, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. Other error(s) with document(s): Correct case number is 2:21cv1650. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 19] NOTICE OF LODGING filed [(Proposed) Order Re Plaintiff's Response to OSC] re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #10 , Response #16 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trope, Konrad) Modified on 6/25/2021 (mrgo).
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slatesto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald P. Slates)(Trope, Konrad)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TEN (10) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #14 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have until June 21, 2021 to file his response to the OSC [Docket Entry No. 10]. (lom)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Response to OSC filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Konrad L. Trope, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Proposed Order) (Trope, Konrad)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Konrad Lytell Trope counsel for Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. Adding Konrad L. Trope as counsel of record for Ronald P. Slates for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Attorney Konrad Lytell Trope added to party Ronald P. Slates(pty:pla))(Trope, Konrad)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ronald P Slates counsel for Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. James W. Denison is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald P Slates. (Slates, Ronald)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) ONLY as to Rowen Pfeifer. (Slates, Ronald)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiffs Complaint appears to violate the rule against claim splitting, which "prevent[s] the same plaintiff from filing multiple suits alleging the same claims against the same defendant when one suit will do." Beckerley v. Alorica, Inc., 14-cv-0836, 2014 WL 4670229, at *4 (C.D. Cal., Sept. 17, 2014). Accordingly, the Court hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the instant action should not be dismissed to prevent claim splitting or under the Courts inherent authority to manage its docket to avoid inconsistent judgments and prevent an inefficient use of judicial resources. Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than Friday, June 11, 2021. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Adama Technologies Corporation, Alpine Industries, LLC, Erik Durrant, International Ambitions, LLC, JA Investment Holdings, LLC, Rowen Pfeifer, Eric Sills, Harold Tanner. (car)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
May 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-01650-PA-PVC (Slates, Ronald)
May 31, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates, (Slates, Ronald)
May 31, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Slates, Ronald)
May 31, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Slates, Ronald)
May 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31382213 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ronald P. Slates. (Attorney Ronald P Slates added to party Ronald P. Slates(pty:pla))(Slates, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald P. Slates v. Adama Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Ambitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adama Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA Investment Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Durrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowen Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald P. Slates
Represented By: Ronald P Slates
Represented By: Konrad Lytell Trope
Represented By: James W Denison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?