Donte House v. Hud Mellencamp
Plaintiff: Donte House
Defendant: Hud Mellencamp and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv04947
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snow, John)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 08/23/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Schiferl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Hud Mellencamp, designating John G. Snow as local counsel #9 . (iv)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04947 MWF(MAAx). (rn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp.(King, Howard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin C. Schiferl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Hud Mellencamp (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31493458) filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Snow, John)
June 19, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Donte House, (Rich, Randall)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp, Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties served on June 17, 2021. (King, Howard)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin C Schiferl. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hud Mellencamp, (King, Howard)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp. (King, Howard)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV19435 Receipt No: BCACDC-31486374 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Hud Mellencamp. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Notice of Case Assignment) (Attorney Howard E King added to party Hud Mellencamp(pty:dft))(King, Howard)
June 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hud Mellencamp, filed by plaintiff Donte House. (filed in state court 5/24/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donte House v. Hud Mellencamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte House
Represented By: Randall B Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hud Mellencamp
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: John G. Snow
Represented By: Kevin C. Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?