AIDS Healthcare Foundation v. Prime Therapeutics LLC
Plaintiff: AIDS Healthcare Foundation
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04979
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Application for Leave to file Under Seal in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Complaint #16 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
August 13, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss #18 filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murray, Jason)
August 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murray, Jason)
August 13, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss under seal #16 filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 1)(Liu, Shira)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 1 to Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss under seal filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit 1)(Liu, Shira)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Charles Griffith counsel for Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. Adding David Charles Griffith as counsel of record for Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attorney David Charles Griffith added to party Prime Therapeutics LLC(pty:dft))(Griffith, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu counsel for Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. Adding Shira Rebecca Liu as counsel of record for Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attorney Shira Rebecca Anne Liu added to party Prime Therapeutics LLC(pty:dft))(Liu, Shira)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC, identifying Prime Therapeutics LLC, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Capital BlueCross, Florida Blue, Health Care Services Corporation (HCSC), Regence Health Plans, Chubb, RSUI Inc.. (Murray, Jason)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC.(Attorney Jason C Murray added to party Prime Therapeutics LLC(pty:dft))(Murray, Jason)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation, upon Defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares/Authorized Personnel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Prime Therapeutics LLC. (lom)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Summons Request #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Eisenberg, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31490044 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Attorney Jonathan Michael Eisenberg added to party AIDS Healthcare Foundation(pty:pla))(Eisenberg, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIDS Healthcare Foundation v. Prime Therapeutics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics LLC
Represented By: Jason C Murray
Represented By: David Charles Griffith
Represented By: Shira Rebecca Anne Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDS Healthcare Foundation
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
Represented By: Courtney N Conner
Represented By: Liza M Brereton
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?