Jillian Briggs et al v. Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jillian Briggs
Defendant: Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848, Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC and Does 1-10
Petitioner: Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv05020
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 15 Summons request filed by Plaintiff Jillian Briggs (Duchrow, David)
August 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Application/Motion/Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. No Judge's initials next to case number; 2. Attached is a Superior Court Complaint - clerk is unable to issue summons on a Superior Court complaint; 3. Incorrect event used - correct efiling event is Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST issue summons Receipt No: ACACDC-31813255 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jillian Briggs.(Duchrow, David)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint from state court #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Jillian Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Demand for Jury Trial)(Duchrow, David)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848.(Barth, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848 answer now due 7/8/2021, filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848.(Barth, Daniel)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Filing of Removal Notice With Clerk of State Court and Service on Plaintiff filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Filing of Removal Notice with Clerk of State Court and Service on Plaintiff)(Levy, Lewis)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
June 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848, Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Jillian Briggs. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/23/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, (Barth, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Barth, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the County of Los Angeles, State of California, case number 21STCV11064 Receipt No: ACACDC-31494831 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Daniel Robert Barth added to party Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters (pty:dft))(Barth, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jillian Briggs et al v. Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Briggs
Represented By: David J. Duchrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Delivery Drivers, General Truck Drivers, Chauffeurs, Warehouse, Sales, Industrial and Allied Workers Union, Teamsters Local 848, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Daniel Robert Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Wholesale Delivery Drivers and Salesmens Local 848
Represented By: Daniel Robert Barth
Represented By: Lewis N Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Glazers Wine and Spirits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?