Todd S. Diener v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd S. Diener
Defendant: LSG Group, Sky Chefs, Inc., LSG Sky Chefs, American Airlines, Inc., Gate Group, Gate Gourmet, Inc. and DOES 1 to 20
Case Number: 2:2021cv05041
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of New York, 1:21-cv-04006 filed 7/15/2021. (iv)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge George H. Wu. Venue in this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. 11) is denied as moot. Defendants Gate Gourmet Inc., Gate Group, and LSG Group are dismissed without prejudice. Within 3 court days of the issuance of thie Order, plaintiff is order to request dismissal of the companion case Diener v. American Airlines, et al., USDC for the Central District of California, case no. 2:21-cv-3810. Case transferred electronically on 7/15/2021. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 First STIPULATION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York filed by Todd S. Diener Todd S. Diener. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [proposed] Order Re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue)(Ounjian, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #11 filed by Defendants American Airlines, Inc., LSG Group, LSG Sky Chefs, Sky Chefs, Inc.. (Griffith, Doug)
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: See below under Other. The filing was in response to clerk's G112 deficiency notice, however filing was not a formal document, but a Letter to the Judge; per LR 83-2.5: no letters to the Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 7, 2021 Filing 16 Correspondence dated July 7, 2021 re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #15 (Ounjian, Robert)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. First page is blank and entitled "Exhibit 1" only. Missing formal title page and its LR-11-3.8 required filer, attorney, court and case information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Todd S. Diener Todd S. Diener, (Ounjian, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 (Lease) to Robert Ounjian Declaration to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (personal) #11 filed by Plaintiff Todd S. Diener. (Ounjian, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(2) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (personal) #11 filed by Plaintiff Todd S. Diener. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert J. Ounjian, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (2020 Report) to Declaration of Robert J. Ounjian, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Email) to Declaration of Robert J. Ounjian, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ounjian, Robert)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 WITHDRAWN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 18] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (personal) filed by Defendants LSG Group, LSG Sky Chefs, Sky Chefs, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/26/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Travis Brewton, #3 Proposed Order) (Griffith, Doug) Modified on 7/14/2021 (mrgo).
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Todd S. Diener Todd S. Diener.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Jury Fees)(Ounjian, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
June 21, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Todd S. Diener in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/5/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants American Airlines, Inc., LSG Group, LSG Sky Chefs, Sky Chefs, Inc. identifying American Airlines Group Inc.; LSG Sky Chefs USA, Inc.; and LSG Lufthansa Service Holding AG as Corporate Parent. (Griffith, Doug)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants American Airlines, Inc., LSG Group, LSG Sky Chefs, Sky Chefs, Inc., identifying American Airlines, Inc.; Sky Chefs, Inc. dba LSG Sky Chefs; and LSG Group. (Griffith, Doug)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants American Airlines, Inc., LSG Group, LSG Sky Chefs, Sky Chefs, Inc.. (Griffith, Doug)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles - Spring Street Courthouse, case number 21STCV16859 Receipt No: ACACDC-31498676 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants LSG Sky Chefs, LSG Group, American Airlines, Inc., Sky Chefs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Doug Griffith added to party American Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Doug Griffith added to party LSG Group(pty:dft), Attorney Doug Griffith added to party LSG Sky Chefs(pty:dft), Attorney Doug Griffith added to party Sky Chefs, Inc.(pty:dft))(Griffith, Doug)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd S. Diener v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSG Group
Represented By: Doug Griffith
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Represented By: Doug Griffith
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSG Sky Chefs
Represented By: Doug Griffith
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Doug Griffith
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gate Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gate Gourmet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd S. Diener
Represented By: Robert John Ounjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?