First Look Institute, Inc. et al v. U. S. Marine Corps
Plaintiff: First Look Institute, Inc. and Sam Biddle
Defendant: United States Marine Corps and U.S. Marine Corps
Case Number: 2:2021cv05087
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to U.S. Marine Corps answer now due 9/10/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant U.S. Marine Corps.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Marine Corps(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed First Look Institute, Inc., Sam Biddle, upon Defendant U.S. Marine Corps served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to N/A. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to N/A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Renata Witcher. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Due Diligence, #2 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to USMC Headquarters, #3 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to USMC FOIA/PA Section, #4 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to US Attorney General)(Burke, Thomas)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: DENYING #15 Non-Resident Attorney David S. Bralow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs First Look Institute, Inc. and Sam Biddle. Terming Attorney David S. Bralow. (lc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Bralow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31558158) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David S. Bralow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31558158) filed by Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Selina Jessie MacLaren added to party Sam Biddle(pty:pla), Attorney Selina Jessie MacLaren added to party First Look Institute, Inc.(pty:pla)) (MacLaren, Selina)
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc., (Burke, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc. (Burke, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victoria Jane Noble counsel for Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc.. Adding Victoria Jane Noble as counsel of record for First Look Institute, Inc. and Sam Biddle for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff First Look Institute, Inc. and Sam Biddle. (Noble, Victoria)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 as to defendant U.S. Marine Corps. (lc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc.. (Burke, Thomas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David S Bralow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The defendant's name is misspelled. Also, in the "To" field show the defendant's name before "See Attachment...". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiffs Sam Biddle, First Look Institute, Inc.. (Burke, Thomas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31522003 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs First Look Institute, Inc., Sam Biddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party Sam Biddle(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Rohlfs Burke added to party First Look Institute, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burke, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Look Institute, Inc. et al v. U. S. Marine Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Look Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Selina Jessie MacLaren
Represented By: Victoria Jane Noble
Represented By: Thomas Rohlfs Burke
Represented By: David S. Bralow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Biddle
Represented By: David S. Bralow
Represented By: Selina Jessie MacLaren
Represented By: Victoria Jane Noble
Represented By: Thomas Rohlfs Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marine Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marine Corps
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?