Margarita Velasquez v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Margarita Velasquez
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05092
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on August 18, 2021 #30 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before September 17, 2021. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until September 17, 2021. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
August 18, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. (Mikhov, Steve)
July 19, 2021 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Gregory R. Mohrman of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. (Mohrman, Gregory)
July 19, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Maite Colon in Response to Order to Show Cause re Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. (Colon, Maite)
July 19, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Mark W. Skanes re Order to Show Cause, #23 re Failure to File Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
July 19, 2021 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Mark W. Skanes of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/20/2022 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/31/2022 at 8:30 AM. (iv)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 26, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 10, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 14, 2022. (iv)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.Counsel are ordered to show cause in writing by July 19, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv)
July 13, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez.. (Colon, Maite)
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Margarita Velasquez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Margarita Velasquez(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 STATEMENT Regarding Rule 7-3 Conference Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Skanes, Mark)
July 12, 2021 Filing 19 STATEMENT Regarding Rule 7-3 Conference Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Skanes, Mark)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman counsel for Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. Adding Greg Mohrman as counsel of record for Margarita Velasquez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez. (Attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman added to party Margarita Velasquez(pty:pla))(Mohrman, Gregory)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice (Other) #16 served on July 1, 2021. (Skanes, Mark)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant FCA US LLC's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #14 served on June 30, 2021. (Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice (Other) #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint #11 served on June 30, 2021. (Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Defendant FCA US LLC's Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of M. Skanes in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order) (Skanes, Mark)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 26, 2021 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 15, 2021. (iv)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
June 23, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT Filed by Plaintiff Margarita Velasquez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/20/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 6/23/2021. (Skanes, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Skanes, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV19127 Receipt No: ACACDC-31510085 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Skanes, #2 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #3 Exhibit B - service of process, #4 Exhibit C - state court papers, #5 Exhibit D - 10K filing, #6 Exhibit E - sales) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margarita Velasquez v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Velasquez
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: Gregory Richard Mohrman
Represented By: Maite Christine Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?