Blalock Home Investments, LLC v. William J. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: Blalock Home Investments, LLC
Defendant: William J. Palmer, Jr., The testate and intestate heirs of William Palmer, Sr., deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under such decedent, William James Palmer, Jr., Robert Whitfield, Davon Gregory, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and All Persons Unknown
Cross Defendant: Does 1-20, Westminster Title Co, Inc., State of California, Jeffery Blalock and Los Angeles County
Case Number: 2:2021cv05097
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 22 Receipt of CV-103 (05/18) LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT (CIVIL) received by Paul Cruz, Deputy Clerk on July 27, 2021. (shb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No.21STCV16388 (lc)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REMANDING CASE AND DENYING PENDING APPLICATIONS AND MOTIONS #10 , #13 , #16 , #18 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction. Remand is appropriate. 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Because the Court lacks jurisdiction over this matter, the Court denies Davon Gregory and Robert Whitfield's applications for permission for electronic filing. (ECF Nos. 10, 13.) The Court also denies Jeffrey Blalock and Blalock Home Investments, LLCs motion to remand and motion to dismiss. (ECF Nos. 16, 18.) The Court remands the case to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 21STCV16388. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complaint of William Palmer , or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement #18 filed by Cross Defendants Jeffery Blalock, Blalock Home Investments, LLC, Plaintiff Blalock Home Investments, LLC. (Widener, Vanessa)
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complaint of William Palmer , or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Cross-Defendants Jeffery Blalock(an individual), Blalock Home Investments, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Widener, Vanessa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Cross-Defendants Jeffery Blalock(an individual), Blalock Home Investments, LLC(a California limited liability company). Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Widener, Vanessa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Cross-Defendants Jeffery Blalock(an individual), Blalock Home Investments, LLC, identifying Blalock Home Investments, LLC, Jeffrey Blalock, and First American Title Insurance Company. (Attorney Vanessa H Widener added to party Jeffery Blalock(pty:crd))(Widener, Vanessa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING REMOVAL/REMAND #8 served on 7/8/21 filed by defendant William J. Palmer, Jr. (lc)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by defendant Robert Whitfield. (lc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Robert Whitfield. (rn)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by defendant Davon Gregory. (lc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER #1 filed by defendant William J. Palmer, Jr. as Beneficiary intestate heir ofthe ESTATE of William Palmer aka William James Palmer(lc)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. The Court orders Defendant Palmer to show cause why the action should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of jurisdiction. Palmer shall file a written response within 14 days. Failure to file a timely and satisfactory response will result in dismissal or remand without further notice. (lc)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant William J. Palmer, Jr. (esa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Cross Complaint #2 The Cross-Defendants are Blalock Home Investmens, LLC; Jeffrey Blalock; Westminser Title Company; Los Angeles County; Does 1 through 20, inclusive (esa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 CROSS COMPLAINT against Counter Defendants Jeffery Blalock, Blalock Home Investments, LLC, State of California, Westminster Title Co, Inc.; Jury Demanded, filed by Cross-complainant William J. Palmer, Jr. (esa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number 21STCV16388 with conformed copy of complaint (see p. 6). Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Filing fee $402 paid, filed by defendant William J. Palmer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 CV 71) (esa)
June 23, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF CROSS COMPLAINT against Cross-defendants Blalock Home Investments, LLC, Jeffery Blalock, Westminster Title Co, Inc., Los Angeles County, State of California, Does; Jury Demand, filed by Cross-complainant Davon Gregory. (filed in state court 6/17/21, document 1, p. 21) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blalock Home Investments, LLC v. William J. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The testate and intestate heirs of William Palmer, Sr., deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under such decedent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William James Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davon Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blalock Home Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jesse S Hernandez
Represented By: Vanessa H Widener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Westminster Title Co, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Jeffery Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?