Carla Vega et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: LEONEL TORRES and CARLA VEGA
Defendant: FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05128
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 set for August 23, 2021 is hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance will be necessary. This matter is appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #17 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson)(Shepardson, Scott)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Kalinowski, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand to Superior Court of California) (Kalinowski, Daniel)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #15 filed by Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. (Kalinowski, Daniel)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN AS OF 7-21-21** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Kalinowski, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand to Superior Court of California) (Kalinowski, Daniel) Modified on 7/22/2021 (yl).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Carla Vega and Leonel Torres for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Carla Vega and Leonel Torres. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Leonel Torres(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Carla Vega(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong event and form used, the correct event is "Notice">"Notice of Lodging" and the correct form CV 11D form has to be attached. Please refer to General Order 18-11.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. (Colon, Maite)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiffs Leonel Torres, Carla Vega. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Carla Vega and Leonel Torres for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Carla Vega and Leonel Torres. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Leonel Torres(pty:pla), Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Carla Vega(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Shepardson, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on June 23, 2021. (Shepardson, Scott)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Carla Vega, Leonel Torres. (filed in state court 3/12/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiffs Carla Vega, Leonel Torres, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 3/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (submitted as document 1, attachment 11) (esa)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (filed in state court 4/20/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, (Shepardson, Scott)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Shepardson, Scott)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV09874 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 06/23/2021, receipt number 08968D), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott S. Shepardson, #2 Declaration of Christopher M. Fisher, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. of Fisher, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. of Fisher, #5 Exhibit C to Decl. of Fisher, #6 Exhibit D to Decl. of Fisher, #7 Exhibit E to Decl. of Fisher, #8 Exhibit F to Decl. of Fisher, #9 Exhibit G to Decl. of Fisher, #10 Exhibit H to Decl. of Fisher, #11 Exhibit I to Decl. of Fisher, #12 Exhibit J to Decl. of Fisher, #13 Exhibit K to Decl. of Fisher, #14 Exhibit L to Decl. of Fisher, #15 Exhibit M to Decl. of Fisher, #16 Exhibit N to Decl. of Fisher) (Attorney Scott Steven Shepardson added to party FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Shepardson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carla Vega et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONEL TORRES
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Daniel Max Kalinowski
Represented By: Maite Christine Colon
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA VEGA
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Daniel Max Kalinowski
Represented By: Maite Christine Colon
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Fisher
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?