Securities and Exchange Commission v. Matthew J. Skinner et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Freedom Equity Fund LLC, Matthew J. Skinner, Simple Growth, LLC, Bayside Equity, LP, Longacre Estates, LP and Empire West Equity, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv05273
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING INJUNCTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court GRANTS the injunction as unopposed against Defendants Matthew J. Skinner (Skinner), Empire West Equity, Inc. (Empire West), Longacre Estates, LP (Longacre), Bayside Equity, LP (Bayside), Freedom Equity Fund LLC (Freedom Fund), and Simple Growth, LLC (Simple Growth) #14 . However, the Court has decided to treat this application as an unopposed application for a temporary restraining order (TRO) in order to provide Defendants an opportunity to submit a written opposition in the event that they wish to challenge the issuance of a preliminary injunction. If Defendants oppose the issuance of a preliminary injunction, they must file a written opposition by 9/8/2021, in which case the Court will set a preliminary injunction hearing. Absent a written objection, the TRO will convert to a preliminary injunction-on the same terms as ordered below-and remain in place until further order of the Court. The TRO below is effective immediately, and Defendants are ordered to comply. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Christopher A. Nowlin in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction #14 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Dean, Lynn)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Conte in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction #14 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dean, Lynn)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Application for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Dean Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Longacre Estates, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Skinner, Principal of the General Partner. (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Empire West Equity, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Skinner, President and CEO. (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Simple Growth, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Skinner, Manager. (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Freedom Equity Fund LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Skinner, Manager. (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Bayside Equity, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Skinner. (Dean, Lynn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Matthew J. Skinner waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Defendant Matthew J. Skinner. (Dean, Lynn)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bayside Equity, LP, Empire West Equity, Inc., Freedom Equity Fund LLC, Longacre Estates, LP, Simple Growth, LLC, Matthew J. Skinner. (ghap)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dean, Lynn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Lynn M. Dean added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Dean, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Matthew J. Skinner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Equity Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Growth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayside Equity, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longacre Estates, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire West Equity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Lynn M. Dean
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?