Silver Peaks, LLC v. CareMore Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: Silver Peaks, LLC
Defendant: Country Villa Belmont Heights Healthcare Center, Does 1-10, Belmont Heights Healthcare Center LLC, Rockport Healthcare Support Services LLC and CareMore Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2021cv05355
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
2 Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION #16 [ #20 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court finds that 1) Caremore Health Plan's Motion to Dismiss Complaint #16 and 2) Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #20 , currently scheduled for hearing on August 13, 2021, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, these motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearings are vacated. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 30, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeals Guideline)(Hill, Crystal)
July 30, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Defendant CareMore Health Planto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #19 OSC re Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Lewis, Carol)
July 29, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY Support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLC. (Hill, Crystal)
July 21, 2021 Filing 23 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Rockport Healthcare Support Services, LLC (lc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Rockport Healthcare Support Services LLC filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons) (Hill, Crystal)
July 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLC, identifying CareMore Health Plan; Country Villa Belmont Heights Healthcare Center; Rockport Healthcare Services, LLC. (Hill, Crystal)
July 16, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit CMS Nonservices, #4 Proposed Order) (Hill, Crystal)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. the parties to Show Cause in writing why the court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. The parties are ORDERED to file simultaneous briefs not to exceed 15 pages on the issue of the court's subject matter jurisdiction by July 30, 2021. (lc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. AMENDED NOTICE OF Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-04608FLA-PD; 8:21-cv-01115-JLS-ADS; 8:21-cv-01149-JVS-JDE; 2:21-cv-05564-SVW-MAA; 8:21-cv-01188-DOC-DFM (Lewis, Carol)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING CAREMORE HEALTH PLAN'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DKT. #11 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant CareMore shall have up to and including August 6, 2021 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (lom)
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) (Lewis, Carol)
July 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-04608-FLA-PD; 8:21-cv-01115-JLS-ADS; 8:21-cv-01149-JVS-JDE (Lewis, Carol)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extend Time to File Answer, #13 filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/9/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CBL ISO to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting 30 Day Extension of Time to Respond) (Lewis, Carol)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
July 5, 2021 Filing 11 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/6/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Lewis ISO Ex-Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond, #2 Proposed Order for 30 day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaintto Respond to) (Lewis, Carol)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 21-01 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-04608 FLA(PDx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:21-cv-05355 FLA(PDx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (rn)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan, re Declaration #3 , Declaration #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 ALL REMOVAL DOCUMENTS served on July 1, 2021. (Lewis, Carol)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan, re Declaration #3 , Declaration #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO USDC served on July 1, 2021. (von Behren, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan, (Attorney William E von Behren added to party CareMore Health Plan(pty:dft))(von Behren, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Gregory Garza re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Letter of Agreement)(Lewis, Carol)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kim Hawthorne re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CareMore Health Plan. (Lewis, Carol)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior, case number 21STVC19894 Receipt No: ACACDC-31563280 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT CareMore Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit A-2 Civil Case Cover Sheet (State), #3 Exhibit A-3 Summons (State), #4 Exhibit A-4 Complaint (State)) (Attorney Carol B Lewis added to party CareMore Health Plan(pty:dft))(Lewis, Carol)
July 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CareMore Health Plan, Country Villa Belmont Heights Healthcare Center, Does 1-10, Rockport Healthcare Support Services LLC, filed by Plaintiff Silver Peaks, LLC. Filed in State Court on 5/26/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver Peaks, LLC v. CareMore Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Belmont Heights Healthcare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Heights Healthcare Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockport Healthcare Support Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareMore Health Plan
Represented By: Carol B Lewis
Represented By: William E von Behren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Peaks, LLC
Represented By: Crystal Hayes Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?