Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lambert Vander Tuig et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Capital Development Resources, Biosynetics, Ben Schactschneider, Galileo Labs, Inc., Lambert Vander Tuig and Biosynetics Management
Case Number: 2:2021cv05381
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Lambert Vander Tuig served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lambert Vander Tuig in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Armstrong, Melissa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Galileo Labs, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Legalinc Corporate Services, Inc., registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Armstrong, Melissa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Biosynetics Management served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agents, Inc., registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Armstrong, Melissa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Capital Development Resources served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agents, Inc., registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Armstrong, Melissa)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Ben Schactschneider served on 7/25/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Schactschneider in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Armstrong, Melissa)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT AND PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed Plaintiffs status report and proof of service. (Docket # 11.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. (vm)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Schactschneider POS, #2 Capital Development Resources POS, #3 Biosynetics Mgmt POS, #4 Galileo Labs, Inc. POS)(Armstrong, Melissa)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before August 13, 2021. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa J. Armstrong APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Amy J. Longo as local counsel. (vm)
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (sbou)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa Armstrong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longo, Amy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa Armstrong. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Biosynetics Management, Capital Development Resources, Galileo Labs, Inc., Ben Schactschneider and Lambert Vander Tuig. (jtil)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Longo, Amy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Amy J. Longo added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Longo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lambert Vander Tuig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Development Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biosynetics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Schactschneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galileo Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambert Vander Tuig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biosynetics Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Longo
Represented By: Melissa J Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?