James Dar, LLC v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Dar, LLC
Defendant: OJCommerce.com, Inc., OJCOMMERCE, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv05422
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY Reply in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Declaration of Selena Rojhani)(Rojhani, Selena)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 filed by Defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida #10 with proof of service filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani in support of opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D in support of opposition)(Rojhani, Selena)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shlomo Y. Hecht, #2 Exhibit D)(Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC, (Rojhani, Selena)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida filed by defendants OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORIES, #2 Declaration of Jacob Weiss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proposed Order) (Lee, Jen-Feng)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Selena Rojhani in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case) (Rojhani, Selena)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to OJCommerce, LLC answer now due 8/9/2021; OJCommerce.com, Inc. answer now due 8/9/2021, filed by defendants OJCommerce, LLC; OJCommerce.com, Inc..(Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
July 2, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, OJCommerce, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc., filed by Plaintiff James Dar, LLC. Filed in State Court on 4/30/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc., identifying NONE. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, Santa Monica Courthouse, case number 21SMCV00815 Receipt No: ACACDC-31574347 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants OJCOMMERCE, LLC, OJCommerce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1-Notice of Case Management Conference, #4 Exhibit 1-ADR Package, #5 Declaration of Hecht, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C) (Attorney Jen-Feng Lee added to party OJCOMMERCE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jen-Feng Lee added to party OJCommerce.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Jen-Feng)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Dar, LLC v. OJCommerce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCommerce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Represented By: Kenneth K Tanji, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJCOMMERCE, LLC
Represented By: Jen-Feng Lee
Represented By: Kenneth K Tanji, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dar, LLC
Represented By: Selena Rojhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?