Connie Parker v. Steven Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Connie Parker
Defendant: Steven Rodriguez, Rodriguez Law, APC and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05574
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Connie Parker re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint #6 . (jp)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED as to Rodriguez law, APC filed by plaintiff Connie Parker. (jp)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED filed by plaintiff Connie Parker. (jp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to 6009 Guildford Hill Lane, Charlotte, NC 28215; Tel: (704) 930-6231. Filed by Plaintiff Connie Parker. (jp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Connie Parker re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #4 . (jp)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Parker, upon Defendant Steven Rodriguez served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tehsin Chagani, authorized to accept on behalf of Steven Rodriguez in compliance with CCP 416.90 by ersonal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (jp)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Connie Parker, upon Defendant Rodriguez Law, APC served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tehsin Chagani, Secretary in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. (jp)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Connie Parker re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) #3 . (jp)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants Steven Rodriguez, Rodriguez Law, APC. (jp)
July 10, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery) #1 filed by plaintiff Connie Parker. (jp)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Connie Parker. (esa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Steven Rodriguez, Rodriguez Law, APC.Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, (Filing fee $ 402 paid), Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Connie Parker. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 cv 71) (esa) Modified on 7/9/2021 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connie Parker v. Steven Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez Law, APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?