Elda Hernandez v. HMSHost Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elda Hernandez
Defendant: HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc. and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05775
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge George H. Wu. Good cause appearing, the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all claims, causes ofaction, and Parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. RE Stipulation to Dismiss Case #17 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (aco)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(A) filed by Defendant Host International, Inc..(Habashy, Christopher)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on 4/1/2022. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 45 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for 5/16/2022 at 8:30 AM. The hearing will be vacated provided astipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on 5/13/2022. (jp)
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement /Joint Notice of Settlement of Case filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Habashy, Christopher)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO DISMSS THREE OF PLAINTIFF'S EIGHT CLAIMS AND PRAYER FOR RELIEF FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation #13 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) The Court dismisses Plaintiffs First Claim for Discrimination in Violation of the California Family Rights Act; (2) The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Second Claim for Retaliation in Violation of the California Family Rights Act; (3) The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Eighth Claim for Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy; and (4) The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Prayer for Relief for Punitive Damages. (bm)
March 29, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Order to Dismiss Three of Plaintiff's Eight Claims and Prayer for Relief for Punitive Damages filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Habashy, Christopher)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the September 2, 2021, scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2021. Discovery cut-off 3/3/2022. Motion hearing cutoff 5/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) Modified on 9/1/2021 (mrgo).
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 09/02/2021 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 Days, filed by Defendant Host International, Inc... (Habashy, Christopher)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Host International, Inc., served on July 16, 2021 and July 20, 2021. (Habashy, Christopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
July 16, 2021 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Elda Hernandez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 16, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to HMSHost Corporation without prejudice filed by plaintiff Elda Hernandez. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
July 16, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Host International, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Host International, Inc., identifying Autogrill Group, Inc. and Autogrill SpA. (Habashy, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Habashy, Christopher)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV22061 Receipt No: ACACDC-31644698 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Answer) (Attorney Christopher Habashy added to party Host International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Habashy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elda Hernandez v. HMSHost Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elda Hernandez
Represented By: Ruben Limonjyan
Represented By: Garen Majarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMSHost Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Habashy
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?