Michael Kenna v. Liveauctioneers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kenna
Defendant: Liveauctioneers, Inc., Live Auctioneers, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, Black River Auction, LLC, Live Auctioneers, LLC., DOES 2-10, inclusive and Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv05862
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. upon Live Auctioneers, LLC. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stacy E. Don. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. upon Liveauctioneers, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stacy E. Don. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Black River Auction, LLC. (shb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Order, #12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. (Schultz, Kelsey)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DOE AMENDMENT NAMING BLACK RIVER AUCTION, LLC ASDOE 1, #10 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The DOE AMENDMENT naming Black River Auction, LLC, a New Jerseylimited liability company as DOE 1 is hereby approved and filed, and Black RiverAuction, LLC is hereby named as a defendant in this action. SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Schultz, Kelsey)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of DOE Amendment filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant)(Schultz, Kelsey)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Live Auctioneers, LLC and Liveauctioneers, Inc. (jtil)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Michael Kenna. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna, (Doniger, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31660372 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenna. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Michael Kenna(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Kenna v. Liveauctioneers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kenna
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: Kelsey Marie Schultz
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liveauctioneers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Auctioneers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black River Auction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Auctioneers, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 2-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?