Ronald Joseph Radke v. Jordan Terrell Carter et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Joseph Radke
Defendant: Jordan Terrell Carter, Universal Music Group Inc. and Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv06168
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke.(Costanza, Kevin)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having received the Notice of Settlement, filed December 28, 2021, vacates all previously set dates. The Court moves the matter to the inactive calendar pending finalization of settlement. The parties shall proceed with the settlement as outlined in the notice. Should the settlement not be finalized within the designated time, the parties shall notify the Court, in writing, and request that the matter be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
December 28, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., Universal Music Group Inc.. (Payne, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 26 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 3, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., Universal Music Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for UMG and Bravado to Respond to Complaint)(Payne, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. answer now due 12/17/2021; Universal Music Group Inc. answer now due 12/17/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.; Universal Music Group Inc..(Attorney Jean-Paul Jassy added to party Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jean-Paul Jassy added to party Universal Music Group Inc.(pty:dft))(Jassy, Jean-Paul)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JORDAN TERRELL CARTER p/k/a PLAYBOI CARTI by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have until December 27, 2021, to serve Defendant Jordan Terrell Carter, pka Playboi Carti with the Summons and Complaint. (mrgo)
October 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Carter filed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Costanza, Kevin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke, upon Defendant Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Costanza, Kevin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke, upon Defendant Universal Music Group Inc. served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon THE CORPORATION TRUST COMPANY, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Costanza, Kevin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. (lom)
October 15, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Universal Music Group Inc. (lom)
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Jordan Terrell Carter. (lom)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Costanza, Kevin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Costanza, Kevin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Costanza, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radketo Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) - optional html form #7 (Costanza, Kevin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Marc C. Levy on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke, identifying None. (Costanza, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marc C Levy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Attachments: #1 Summons UMG, #2 Summons Bravado)(Costanza, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Costanza, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31722668 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ronald Joseph Radke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kevin S Costanza added to party Ronald Joseph Radke(pty:pla))(Costanza, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Joseph Radke v. Jordan Terrell Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Joseph Radke
Represented By: Brigid C Mahoney
Represented By: Kevin S Costanza
Represented By: Brigid Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Terrell Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Payne
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Payne
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?