Darrian O'Reilly v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darrian O'Reilly
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. and The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv06258
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
2 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Georgia, 1:21-cv-03372 filed 8/18/2021. (iv)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 Conditional Transfer Order - 32 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2974, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Georgia and assigned to Honorable Leigh Martin May. Case transferred electronically on 8/18/2021. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for September 16, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as requiredby F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than September 9, 2021. (iv)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-06258 GW(MAAx). (rn)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant The Cooper Companies, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Women's Health, LLC.(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant CooperSurgical, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 08/03/2021. (Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., (Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CooperSurgical, Inc.. (Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV23077 Receipt No: ACACDC-31739175 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party CooperSurgical, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party The Cooper Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Allison)
August 3, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Darrian O'Reilly. (filed in state court 6/18/21, submitted as document 1, attached 2, p.21) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrian O'Reilly v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrian O'Reilly
Represented By: Lauren A Welling
Represented By: Timothy M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?