Edgar C. Loualhati et al v. US Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Edgar C. Loualhati and Asuncion Loualhati
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2021cv06285
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - RULING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SALE AND LEAVE TO AMEND EXPEDITED RULING REQUIRED BY OCTOBER 1, 2021, PENDING PRIVATE SALE by Judge George H. Wu re: #16 EX PARTE APPLICATION. At this time, the Court would deny the Motion without prejudice. A party seeking a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction relief must demonstrate: (see document for details). Plaintiffs have failed to make sufficient factual allegations or present evidence supporting their request, including information about the private sale which they seek to consummate, such as the closing date of the sale or whether the sale is even under contract. (See document for additional details). Accordingly, the Court DENIES the plaintiffs' Motion without prejudice. The Court also orders a response to the Motion from the defendant, due no later than October 4, 2021. (mrgo)
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Plaintiffs in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to Amend Expedited Ruling Required by October 1, 2021 Pending Private Sale #16 filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (mrgo)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 EMERGENCY MOTION for Sale and Leave to Amend Expedited Ruling Required by October 1, 2021 Pending Private Sale filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (et)
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant US Bank National Association, identifying US Bank National Association as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Motion or to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant US Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Melissa Robbins Coutts added to party US Bank National Association(pty:dft)) (Coutts, Melissa)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edgar C. Loualhati, Asuncion Loualhati, upon Defendant US Bank National Association served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Johnson, Vice President in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL Executed by Plaintiff US Bank National Association, upon Defendant US Bank National Association served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon (no name or title) in compliance with statute not specified by mail. (mrgo)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER #4 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS ORDERED that the lis pendens is based on the complaint for declaratory relief, damages and quiet title and shall be issued. (iv)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant US Bank National Association. (car)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF LIS PENDENS FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS filed by Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (car)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (car)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Asuncion Loualhati, Edgar C. Loualhati. (car)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant US Bank National Association. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Edgar C. Loualhati, Asuncion Loualhati. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgar C. Loualhati et al v. US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar C. Loualhati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asuncion Loualhati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?