GHP Management Corporation et al v. City of Los Angeles
Plaintiff: PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC a California corporation doing business as Broadway Palace Apartments, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Broadway Palace Apartments, Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as The Da Vinci Apartments, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P. a Delaware limited partnership doing business as The Orsini, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P. a Delaware limited partnership doing business as The Orsini, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as The Orsini, BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as Pasadena Park Place, PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as The Piero Apartments, PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P. California limited partnership doing business as The Visconti Apartments, FIGTER LTD a California limited partnership doing business as Skyline Terrace Apartments, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD California limited partnership doing business as Summit at Warner Center and PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P. California limited partnership doing business as The Visconti Apartments
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Petitioner: GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD and PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv06311
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
2 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
3 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See minute order for further details. (lom)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-00486 DDP(JEMx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06311 DDP(JEMx). Signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (rn)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-05193-DDP-JEM; 2:21-cv-00486-DDP-JEM (Zhong, Elaine)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CITY OF LOS ANGELES answer now due 10/18/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #3 filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES.(Attorney Elaine Zhong added to party CITY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:dft))(Zhong, Elaine)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD, PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., upon Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City of Los Angeles in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dennington, Douglas)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (jtil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #3 filed by Plaintiffs 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD. (Dennington, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Movants 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD. correcting Summons Request,, #4 (Dennington, Douglas)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #3 filed by Plaintiffs 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD. (Dennington, Douglas)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402 paid on 08/04/2021, receipt number 31750702), filed by Plaintiffs PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD, PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P.. (Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party FIGTER LTD(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD(pty:bkmov))(Dennington, Douglas)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, identifying None. (Dennington, Douglas)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC, BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P., FIGTER LTD, GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC, PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P., PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P., PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P., PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P., Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD. (Dennington, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GHP Management Corporation et al v. City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GHP MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FIGTER LTD
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER/CITY CENTER II, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 918 BROADWAY ASSOCIATES, LLC a California corporation doing business as Broadway Palace Apartments
Represented By: Jayson Alan Parsons
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LR 9th & BROADWAY, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Broadway Palace Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as The Da Vinci Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES I, L.P. a Delaware limited partnership doing business as The Orsini
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES II, L.P. a Delaware limited partnership doing business as The Orsini
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER BOSTON STREET PROPERTIES III, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as The Orsini
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDEWELL PROPERTIES, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as Pasadena Park Place
Represented By: Jayson Alan Parsons
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER ST. PAUL PROPERTIES, L.P. a California limited partnership doing business as The Piero Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER/SIXTH STREET PROPERTIES, L.P. California limited partnership doing business as The Visconti Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIGTER LTD a California limited partnership doing business as Skyline Terrace Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARNER CENTER SUMMIT, LTD California limited partnership doing business as Summit at Warner Center
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMER/THIRD STREET PROPERTIES, L.P. California limited partnership doing business as The Visconti Apartments
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Craig Takenaka
Represented By: Elaine Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?