King Mwasi v. Ralph Diaz
Plaintiff: King Mwasi
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, D. Romero, D.J. Williams, K. Thomas, T.L. Hayes, Guillermo Moreno, Jr., Daniel A. Evanilla, D. Mebane, Kathleen Allison, B. Castorena, C. Wofford, K. Disney, Spriggs, Anthony Chaus and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 2:2021cv06467
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint #1 ; JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff King Mwasi(hr) Modified on 10/1/2021 (hr).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint #13 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Western Division for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/10/2021. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint filed by King Mwasi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #11 FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Complaint due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/5/2021. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by King Mwasi. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (cvS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #9 TO REOPEN CASE AND VACATING JUDGMENT; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2020. NOTE: Two copies of court's form complaint with a copy of this order, copy of Dkt. No. 9 motion to reopen and copy of Dkt. 1 complaint mailed to Plaintiff.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by K. Mwasi. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/20/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/9/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/20/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/9/2020. (NOTE: Copy of Order and attached instructions mailed to Plaintiff and Prison's Trust Account Office, and emailed to Court's financial office by AMK) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Complaint due by 10/7/2020. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/9/2020. (NOTE: Copy of order and 2 copies of the court's form complaint mailed to Plaintiff by AMK) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by K. Mwasi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/8/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by K. Mwasi. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (prisoner civil rights) against Ralf Diaz. Filed byK. Mwasi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 letter)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/11/2021.] Modified on 8/11/2021 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Mwasi v. Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Mwasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.L. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Moreno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Evanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mebane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Castorena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spriggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Chaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?