Kourtney Nealy v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kourtney Nealy
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Russell Westbrook Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram of Van Nuys and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06552
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 34 Receipt of Remand from Los Angeles County Superior Court on 5/2/2022. (lc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kourtney Nealy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Kourtney Nealy(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 32 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 21STCV15884. (lc)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #22 AND REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS) #23 , #26 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Case Remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court No. 21STCV15884. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lc)
April 4, 2022 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court finds the Motion to Remand Case #22 set for hearing on 4/7/2022 at 10:00 AM appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for 4/7/2022, is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on 4/7/2022. The Request for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear Telephonically is DENIED AS MOOT. #28 (THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 30, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas A Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Douglas A Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Douglas)
March 30, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Scheduling Conference Hearing filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Request set for hearing on 4/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew)
March 24, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #22 filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Law, Daniel)
March 17, 2022 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
March 17, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot In support of FCA Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
March 17, 2022 Filing 24 opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 25, 2022 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #22 filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Law, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand) (Law, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 21 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Kourtney Nealy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Kourtney Nealy(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the Order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-027) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06552 MEMF(SHKx). (rn)
January 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Regina Lotardo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Law, Daniel)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' 11/5/2021 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: Deadline to file joint report regarding agreed upon private neutral: 11/23/2021. Last day to amend or add parties: 12/17/2021. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 4/19/2022. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 4/22/2022. Post Mediation Status Conference: 5/2/2022 at 11:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 8/8/2022. Initial Expert Disclosures: 8/22/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 9/6/2022. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 9/19/2022. Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions): 9/19/2022. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 19, 2022. Post Mediation Status Conference set for 5/2/2022 11:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (tj)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy.. (Law, Daniel)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Kourtney Nealy(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER ISSUED ON August 16, 2021 (DKT. #10 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Scheduling Conference will be taken under submission after the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report is filed. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (droj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (droj)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
August 12, 2021 First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kourtney Nealy served 7/16/2021, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
August 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants FCA US LLC, Russell Westbrook Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram of Van Nuys in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/6/2021, attached as Exhibit 3.(jtil)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV15884 Receipt No: ACACDC-31800899 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 First Amended Complaint - State Court, #3 Answer to First Amended Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kourtney Nealy v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kourtney Nealy
Represented By: Ezra Gichun Ryu
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Represented By: Douglas A Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Westbrook Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram of Van Nuys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?