Norma Olaso et al v. Alexandria Care Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Norma Olaso and Nelson Olaso
Defendant: Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Alexandria Care Center, LLC doing business as Genesis Healthcare also known as Alexandria Care Center, a California Skilled Nursing Facility, Alexandria Care Center, a California Skilled Nursing Facility, Summit Care, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06589
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-56083 as to defendants Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan. (lc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Terminated Case,,, #17 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32092233.) (Brooks, Nicole)
September 24, 2021 Filing 24 Receipt of remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 9/17/2021. (lc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC 30- DAY STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF COURT'S SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 ORDER TO REMAND (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS ) #22 . (lc) Modified on 9/15/2021 (lc).
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 First REQUEST to Stay Case pending Request for Automatic 30-day Stay of Enforcement of Court's 9/10/21 Order to Remand filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Requesting Automatic 30-Day Stay of Enforcement of Court's 9/10/21 Order to Remand) (Brooks, Nicole)
September 13, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document #19 (Request for 90-day Stay of Remand) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by September 15, 2021. (smo)
September 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request : Order. The incorrect event does NOT seek any relief from the Court. Missing proposed order which should have been submitted as a separate attachment; attached exhibits efiled with prior electronic headers intact, thus making their current headers illegible. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Automatic 30-Day Stay of Enforcement of Court's 9/10/21 Order to Remand filed by Defendants Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Terminated Case,,, #17 (Brooks, Nicole)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 21STCV20905 (lc)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER OF REMAND. The Court ordered Removing Defendants to show cause why the case should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Removing Defendants and Plaintiffs filed responses. Nothing in the parties' responses persuades the Court to reject the overwhelming weight of authorities concluding that federal courts lack subject matter jurisdiction over cases like this one. The Court denies Removing Defendants' request for jurisdictional discovery #13 . The Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction. The Court remands the case to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 21STCV20905, and directs the Clerk to close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Nelson Olasoto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #10 Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Christian Oliver, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Oliver, Christian)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lusine Ter Oganesyan re Response #14 filed by Defendants Alexandria Care Center, LLC, Lusine Ter Oganesyan. (Brooks, Nicole)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC (Brooks, Nicole)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document #11 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed. (smo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Ruling (Brooks, Nicole)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Removing Defendants to show cause why the case should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Removing Defendants shall file a written memorandum within ten days. Plaintiffs may respond to Removing Defendants' memorandum within ten days of its filing. The Court orders Removing Defendants to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiffs. (lc)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC. (Brooks, Nicole)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC, (Brooks, Nicole)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 08/13/2021. (Brooks, Nicole)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC. (Brooks, Nicole)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV20905 Receipt No: ACACDC-31808116 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Alexandria Care Center, LLC. (Attorney Nicole K Brooks added to party Alexandria Care Center, LLC(pty:dft))(Brooks, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Olaso et al v. Alexandria Care Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Olaso
Represented By: Allen Oghassabian
Represented By: Christian Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Olaso
Represented By: Allen Oghassabian
Represented By: Christian Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Nicole K Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Care Center, LLC doing business as Genesis Healthcare also known as Alexandria Care Center, a California Skilled Nursing Facility
Represented By: Nicole K Brooks
Represented By: Lisa Anne Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Care Center, a California Skilled Nursing Facility
Represented By: Nicole K Brooks
Represented By: Lisa Anne Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lusine Ter Oganesyan
Represented By: Lisa Anne Cross
Represented By: Nicole K Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?