Kyu Hwa Back v. James S. Herman et al
Plaintiff: Kyu Hwa Back
Defendant: James S. Herman, Jr. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv06760
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: For the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other construction- related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kyu Hwa Backto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel shall also support their responses to the Order to Show Cause with declarations, signed under penalty of perjury, providing all facts necessary for the Court to determine if they satisfy the definition of a "high-frequency litigant" as provided by California Civil Procedure Code sections 425.55(b)(1) & (2). Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than October 4, 2021. (See document for details) (mrgo)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant James S. Herman, Jr. (lh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Kyu Hwa Back. (Kim, Jason)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kyu Hwa Back. (Kim, Jason)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31847452 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kyu Hwa Back(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyu Hwa Back v. James S. Herman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyu Hwa Back
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Herman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?