Leon Samuel et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff: Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, South Bay Ford Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv06767
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses in the amount of $42,481.00 to Plaintiffs #53 , #54 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 30, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Joint [Proposed] Order re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees #53 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Plaintiffs'Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Dkt. #39 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #39 set for Monday, January 9, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2023 Filing 51 JUDGMENT #30 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See judgment for specifics. (lom)
December 29, 2022 Filing 50 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Costs, #45 , Non-Opposition to Motion #44 , Objection #49 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #43 , Order #46 , Reply (Motion related),, #48 e-mailed to Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed nsadeghi-movahed@slpattorney.com bounced due to No longer at firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 23, 2022 Filing 49 OBJECTIONS to Response in Opposition to Motion, #43 to Declaration of Patricia H. Jun filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 23, 2022 Filing 48 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Breita Linnell in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Breita Linnell in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Breita Linnell in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Breita Linnell in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 22, 2022 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Debora Rabieian counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding Breita Linnell as counsel of record for LEON SAMUEL and PHYLLIS AUBREY-SAMUEL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff LEON SAMUEL and PHYLLIS AUBREY-SAMUEL. (Rabieian, Debora)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Resolve Costs and Expenses and Request for Entry of Judgment #45 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
December 19, 2022 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION for Costs against Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiff Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Resolve Costs and Expenses and Request For Entry of Judgment)(Rabieian, Debora)
December 19, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company #38 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
December 19, 2022 Filing 43 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Jun, Patricia)
November 21, 2022 Filing 42 JOINT STATEMENT of Attorneys Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Rabieian, Debora)
November 21, 2022 Filing 41 JOINT STATEMENT of Costs and Expenses NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Rabieian, Debora)
November 21, 2022 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #39 filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Rabieian, Debora)
November 21, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Payam Shahian In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Expenses, #2 Declaration Of Debora Rabieian In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Attorney Fees, Costs And Expenses, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Expenses) (Rabieian, Debora)
November 21, 2022 Filing 38 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Debora Rabieian In Support Of Plaintiffs Application For The Bill Of Costs) (Rabieian, Debora)
November 21, 2022 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Debora Rabieian counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding Debora Rabieian as counsel of record for Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel and Leon Samuel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel and Leon Samuel. (Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Rabieian, Debora)
October 3, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document Nos. #33 and #35 were not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with flattened versions. (jp)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue Court's Jurisdiction Over Settlement #34 . The Court retains Jurisdiction over the action for 60 days from the date of this Order. (jp) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/13/2022) (jp).
September 22, 2022 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Continue Court's Jurisdiction over Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Court's Jurisdiction over Settlement)(Dolin, Tionna)
September 9, 2022 Filing 33 JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court therefore enters judgment in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 offer #31 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. In light of the Notice of Acceptance of the Rule 68 Offer of Judgment filed on 8/22/2022, the pretrial conference currently set for 9/12/2022 at 8:30 a.m. and the trial date currently set for 8/23/2022 at 8:30 a.m. are VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
September 8, 2022 Filing 31 REQUEST for Judgment filed by Plaintiff Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 22, 2022 Filing 30 Notice OF ACCEPTANCE OF FED. R. CIV. P. 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jun, Patricia)
July 26, 2022 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Joint Mediation Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 26, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 7, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 26, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance, #23 , Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date #24 , Order #25 e-mailed to Karin Kuemerle bounced due to unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer APPROVED Joint Stipulation to Continue Fact Discovery and Expert Depositions Through 6/24/2022 #24 . The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 9/12/2022 at 3:00 PM. The Trial is continued to 10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 3, 2022 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 6/24/22 filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of P. Jun, #2 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
May 3, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
April 29, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE filed by Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Arabi, Mani)
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Leon Samuel and Phyllis-Samuel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Leon Samuel and Phyllis-Samuel. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 19, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed counsel for Plaintiff Leon Samuel. Adding Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed as counsel of record for LEON SAMUEL and PHYLLIS AUBREY-SAMUEL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' LEON SAMUEL and PHYLLIS AUBREY-SAMUEL. (Attorney Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Sadeghi-Movahed, Negeen)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
March 4, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel and Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/19/22. (rfi)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patricia H Jun counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Adding Patricia H. Jun as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Patricia H Jun added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Jun, Patricia)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel.. (Law, Daniel)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Continue to continue September 27, 2021 Scheduling Conference #10 . (et)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 27, 2021 filed by Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law ISO Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation)(Law, Daniel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, Leon Samuel. Adding DANIEL LAW as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LEON SAMUEL and PHYLLIS AUBREY-SAMUEL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff PLAINTIFF. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Leon Samuel(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dd)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
August 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Ford Motor Company, South Bay Ford Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel. (filed in state court 2/8/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
August 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, upon Defendant South Bay Ford Inc. served on 3/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michelle Castillo, Administrative Assistant, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 3/5/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 11) (esa)
August 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 3/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 3/5/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 10) (esa)
August 20, 2021 COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiffs Leon Samuel, Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel as to defendant South Bay Ford Inc. (filed in state court 7/21/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
August 20, 2021 CONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Ford Motor Company, South Bay Ford Inc. (filed in state court 4/5/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Mortenson, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 21STCV05037 Receipt No: ACACDC-31848443 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon Samuel et al v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Samuel
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Aubrey-Samuel
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Negeen Sadeghi-Movahed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: David M Keithly
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bay Ford Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?