In the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society and In the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Case Number: 2:2021cv07102
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING SECURITY AND AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND COSTS #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the Stipulation Regarding Security for Value and Costs of the SHARPIE, and the proposed Letter of Undertaking are approved, and the executed copy filed with this Court as Dkt. 9-1 shall be deemed to be security approved by this Court in accordance with Rule F(1) of the Supplemental Admiralty Rules. That since the owner of the SHARPIE has complied with Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1), and therefore, "all claims and proceedings against the owner or the owner's property with respect to the matter in question shall cease" in accordance with Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(3) and 46 U.S.C. 30511(c). (lom) Modified on 9/27/2021 (lom). Modified on 9/27/2021 (lom).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENIED AS MOOT RE AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND COSTS #4 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lom)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER In Chambers by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. On September 23, 2021, Plaintiff in Limitation filed an application for approval of a security and ad interim stipulation for value and costs (Appl., ECF No. 9), satisfying its obligations under Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(1). Accordingly, pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule F(4), all persons asserting claims with respect to which the Complaint (ECF No. 1) seeks limitation, are admonished to file their respective claims with the Court and to serve on the attorneys for the Plaintiff a copy thereof on or before October 27, 2021. (lom)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Order for approval of security and ad interim stipulation for value and costs filed by Plaintiff in Limitation In the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Undertaking, #2 Proposed Order) (Schultz, Pamela)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-02553 ODW(KSx). Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07102 ODW(KSx). Signed by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (rn)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Order for Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Costs filed by Plaintiff in Limitation Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Schultz, Pamela)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Conservation Society (Schultz, Pamela)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Schultz, Pamela)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31922304 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff in Limitation Sea Shepherd Conservation Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trenkle Declaration) (Attorney Pamela L Schultz added to party Sea Shepherd Conservation Society(pty:pla))(Schultz, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Represented By: Pamela L Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the matter of the Complaint of Sea Shepherd Conservation Society
Represented By: Bradley H Pace
Represented By: Pamela L Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?