Reel One International Limited v. Screenings Distribution, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reel One International Limited
Defendant: Screenings Distribution, Inc., Manuel Corbi, Corbi Media S.L. and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07227
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Corbi Media S.L. (iv)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 12/13/2021 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Corbi Media S.L. filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sacha V. Emanuel in Support of Application for Entry of Default of Defendant Corbi Media S.L., #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sacha V. Emanuel in Support of Application for Entry of Default of Defendant Corbi Media S.L.) (Emanuel, Sacha)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reel One International Limited, upon Defendant Corbi Media S.L. served on 10/2/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria M. Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Emanuel, Sacha)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reel One International Limited, upon Defendant Screenings Distribution, Inc. served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mariela Padrino Administration in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Emanuel, Sacha)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Reel One International Limited, upon Defendant Manuel Corbi served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mariela M. Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Emanuel, Sacha)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Manuel Corbi, identifying Screening Distribution Inc.. (Ravine, Vincent)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Manuel Corbi.(Attorney Vincent L Ravine added to party Manuel Corbi(pty:dft))(Ravine, Vincent)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Screenings Distribution, Inc. (esa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Corbi Media S.L. (esa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Manuel Corbi. (esa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Emanuel, Sacha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Emanuel, Sacha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Emanuel, Sacha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited, identifying Reel One International Limited, Premiere Bobine Inc., Screenings Distribution, Inc., Manuel Corbi, and Corbi Media S.L.. (Emanuel, Sacha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Emanuel, Sacha)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31949817 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Reel One International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint) (Attorney Sacha V Emanuel added to party Reel One International Limited(pty:pla))(Emanuel, Sacha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reel One International Limited v. Screenings Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reel One International Limited
Represented By: Sacha V Emanuel
Represented By: Steven R Lowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screenings Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Corbi
Represented By: Vincent L Ravine
Represented By: Kyle C Rambeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbi Media S.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?