Savage Investments, LLC v. Dallas Steven Snoderly, et al
Plaintiff: Savage Investments, LLC
Defendant: Dallas Steven Snoderly and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07557
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07557 FMO(JPRx). (rn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Dallas Steven Snoderly. (esa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Savage Investments, LLC. (Kheiri, Babak)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Savage Investments, LLC. (Kheiri, Babak)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 SAVAGE INVESTMENTS, LLC's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Kheiri, Babak)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32023923 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Savage Investments, LLC. (Attorney Babak Kheiri added to party Savage Investments, LLC(pty:pla))(Kheiri, Babak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage Investments, LLC v. Dallas Steven Snoderly, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savage Investments, LLC
Represented By: Babak Kheiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Steven Snoderly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?