Angela Mendoza et al v. Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Mendoza
Defendant: Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. doing business as The Rowland formerly known as Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Does 1-50 and Does 51-60
Case Number: 2:2021cv07628
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #11 , the Court orders that Defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. dba The Rowland f/k/a Rowland Convalescent Hospital will have ten days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (gk)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlueck, Krista)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #9 , the Court hereby Orders that Defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. dba The Rowland f/k/a Rowland Convalescent Hospital has until 10/29/2021 to respond to the complaint. (gk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. answer now due 10/29/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schlueck, Krista)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Removal filed by Defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-PREP Act Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Declaration Invoking PREP Act, #4 Exhibit D-2nd Amended Declaration Invoking PREP Act, #5 Exhibit E-4th Amended HHS Declaration, #6 Exhibit F-HHS Letter Prep Act 8.14.2020, #7 Exhibit G-HHS Advisory Opinion 10.22.20, #8 Exhibit H-PREP Act Advisory Op by HHS, #9 Exhibit I-PREP Act Covered devices and tests, #10 Exhibit J-CDC Jan 8, 2020, #11 Exhibit K-CDC Jan 8, 2020, #12 Exhibit L-CDC Jan 24, 2020, #13 Exhibit M-CDC Jan Feb 1, 2020 Updated Guidance, #14 Exhibit N-CDPH AFLS Jan & Feb 2020, #15 Exhibit O-CMS Feb 6, 2020 Memo, #16 Exhibit P-CDC Feb 28, 2020 Updated Interim Guidance, #17 Exhibit Q-March 3, 2020 CDC Strategies, #18 Exhibit R-CDPH AFL March 3, 2020, #19 Exhibit S-CMS March 4, 2020 Memo, #20 Exhibit T-CDC March 8, 2020 Updated Guidance, #21 Exhibit U-CDC March 10, 2020, #22 Exhibit V-CMS March 10, 2020 Memo, #23 Exhibit W-CDPH AFL 20-22 March 11, 2020, #24 Exhibit X-CMS March 13, 2020 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y-March 17, 2020 CDC Memos, #26 Exhibit Z-CMS March 20, 2020 QSO 20-20, #27 Exhibit AA-March 21, 2020 CDC Prep for Covid 19, #28 Exhibit BB-April 2, 2020 CMS Covid 19 LTCF Guidance, #29 Exhibit CC-5th Amended Dec Invoking PREP Act, #30 Exhibit DD-HHS Advisory Opinion 21-01 Jan 8, 2021, #31 Exhibit FF-Designation of Scarce Materials by HHS, #32 Exhibit GG-Rachal v. Natchitoches, #33 Exhibit HH-Umbrella EUA for surgical masts, #34 Exhibit II-Hand Sanitizer Revised Final Guidance, #35 Exhibit JJ-Surveys)(Schlueck, Krista)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc., (Schlueck, Krista)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.. (Schlueck, Krista)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LA County Su perior, case number 21STCV30713 Receipt No: ACACDC-32041449 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Krista Schlueck added to party Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schlueck, Krista)
September 24, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does(1-50), Does (51-60), Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Angela Mendoza. (filed in state court 8/19/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 24, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Angela Mendoza, upon Defendant Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. served on 8/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anthony Kalomas, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 8/26/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Mendoza et al v. Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Convalescent Hospital, Inc. doing business as The Rowland formerly known as Rowland Convalescent Hospital
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Represented By: William C Wilson
Represented By: Krista Schlueck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Convalescent Hospital
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Represented By: William C Wilson
Represented By: Krista Schlueck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 51-60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mendoza
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?