Anto Supriyanto et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: Anto Supriyanto and Ruli Astiliti
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Petitioner: The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv07635
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #14 filed by Plaintiffs Ruli Astiliti, Anto Supriyanto. (Shapero, Sarah)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (DKT. #14 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Defendant has set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from March 7, 2022 to March 14, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #14 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Campbell, John)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Campbell, John)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2021. (tj)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Sarah Elizabeth Shapero counsel for Plaintiffs Ruli Astiliti, Anto Supriyanto. Changing Address to 100 Pine Street., Suite 530, San Francisco, CA 94111. Filed by Plaintiffs Ruli Astiliti, Anto Supriyanto. (Shapero, Sarah)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06068 JAK(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07635 JAK(Ex). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer now due 10/29/2021; The Bank of New York Mellon answer now due 10/29/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC; The Bank of New York Mellon.(Campbell, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-06068 JAK (Campbell, John)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
September 24, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Anto Supriyanto, Ruli Astiliti. Filed in State Court on 8/24/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and Computershare Limited. (Campbell, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Movant The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Campbell, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21VECV01126 Receipt No: ACACDC-32043093 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:bkmov))(Campbell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anto Supriyanto et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anto Supriyanto
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruli Astiliti
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Bank of New York fka The Bank of New York, as Successor Trustee to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?