Anjay Rastogi v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: Anjay Rastogi
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Case Number: 2:2021cv07637
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E- Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non- sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (twdb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Anjay Rastogi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (twdb)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Anjay Rastogi, (esa)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Internal Revenue.Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner,(Filing fee $ 402 paid), filed by plaintiff Anjay Rastogi. (Attachments: #1 CV 71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anjay Rastogi v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjay Rastogi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?