Kenneth Gray v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gray
Defendant: County of Los Angeles, Sheriff Alex Villanueva, City of West Hollywood, Los Angeles County Sheriff Department and Does 1-10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07685
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE #1 by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is presently screening the complaint in this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Until the complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendant(s). Should the Court determine that the complaint may be served upon defendant(s), the Court will provide plaintiff with instructions regarding service of process. [See document for details.] (es)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment General Order 05-07 referral pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07685 DMG (AFM). (esa)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: IT IS ORDERED that the REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #6 is hereby GRANTED. (es)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Kenneth Gray. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (es)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Additional Information Concerning In Forma Pauperis Application by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: No later than 14 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended IFP application (labeled as such), indicating (1) the amount of available equity in his home and (2) whether his spouse is employed and, if so, the spouse's salary and whether he has access to that money. [See document for additional information.] (es)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Gray. (car)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Gray (car)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth Gray v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Alex Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Hollywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?