Kent Sachs v. Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Kevin Sachs
Defendant: Pankow Operating, Inc., Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd. and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07742
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY In Support of a Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed by Plaintiff Kevin Sachs. (Zabehi, Tara)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd., Pankow Operating, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward Farricker in Opposition to Motion to Remand of Plaintiff Kent Sachs)(Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Pankow Operating, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wallin, Allison)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 Pankow Operating, Inc.'s Consent to Removal re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Wallin, Allison)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Kevin Sachs. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tara Zabehi In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Zabehi, Tara)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tara Zabehi counsel for Plaintiff Kevin Sachs. Adding Tara Zabehi as counsel of record for Kent Sachs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kent Sachs. (Attorney Tara Zabehi added to party Kevin Sachs(pty:pla))(Zabehi, Tara)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07742 AB(ADSx). (rn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd., identifying Pankow Operating, Inc.. (Wallin, Allison)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV27460 Receipt No: ACACDC-32067907 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward Farricker, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Edward Farricker, #3 Exhibit B to nthe Declaration of Edward Farricker, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 3 to the Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit 4 to the Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit 5 to the Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Allison Steincipher Wallin added to party Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Wallin, Allison)
September 29, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/27/2021, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
September 29, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kevin Sachs in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/27/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent Sachs v. Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sachs
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Tara Zabehi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pankow Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Pankow Builders, Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Steincipher Wallin
Represented By: Phillip R Maltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?