Aaron Unger v. Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Unger
Defendant: Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP, Arthur P. Brazy, Jr., Matthew P. Carbone, James F. Brown, Edmond G. Leung, Keith Benson, Thomas Carey White III and Gerald A. Tywoniuk
Case Number: 2:2021cv07849
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
November 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-07849 VAP(MARx). (rn)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. (Smith, Evan)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: WAIVER OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed Plaintiffs waiver of service. (Docket # 11 and 12.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. (vm)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. upon Arthur P. Brazy, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/1/2022; Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/1/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen Blake, Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP. (Smith, Evan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. upon Keith Benson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021; Gerald A. Tywoniuk waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021; Thomas Carey White III waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Brian M. Lutz, Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP. (Smith, Evan)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to James F. Brown, Matthew P. Carbone, Edmond G. Leung. (Smith, Evan)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before November 12, 2021. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued Re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) as to Defendant Keith Benson, Arthur P. Brazy, Jr., James F. Brown, Matthew P. Carbone, Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP, Edmond G. Leung, Gerald A. Tywoniuk, Thomas Carey White III. #1 (vm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. (Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. (Smith, Evan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger, (Smith, Evan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. (Smith, Evan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32085363 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Aaron Unger. (Attorney Evan Jason Smith added to party Aaron Unger(pty:pla))(Smith, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Unger v. Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Unger
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan P Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Infrastructure Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur P. Brazy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond G. Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Carey White III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald A. Tywoniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?