Elaine Chung Oliver v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Chung Oliver
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv07908
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #38 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #39 served on 11/16/21. (Tom, Meagan)
November 16, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, (Amended) served on 11/16/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
November 16, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, (Amended) served on 11/15/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
November 14, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association #34 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Counsel is ordered to file an amended document with the correct case number forthwith. (lc)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (DKT. #9 ) AND PLAINTIFF ELAINE CHUNG OLIVER'S MOTION TO REMAND (DKT. #16 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand currently scheduled for hearing on November 19, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, these motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number has prior Magistrate initials on case number as "SK". Case number is to read correctly as 2:21-cv-07908-FLA-RAO... as reflected on the reply to which this proof was filed re docket no. 33. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Reply #33 to Request for Judicial Notice served on 11/5/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 33 REPLY filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association to Request for Judicial Notice #10 (Tom, Meagan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Reply (Motion related) #31 in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint served on 11/5/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof #9 filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION MOTION TO REMAND #27 Erroneous duplicate entry of docket no. 25 (lc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE #24 , #25 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (lc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #9 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (lc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #16 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (lc) Modified on 11/1/2021 (lc).
October 29, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #16 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (lc) Modified on 11/1/2021 (lc).
October 29, 2021 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND #16 , AND AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION to DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #9 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver (Duplicate copy marked for docketing by intake) (lc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND #16 , AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION to DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #9 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (lc)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT(DKT. #9 ) AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT (DKT. #16 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: This Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint(DKT. #9 ) AND the Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court (DKT. #16 ) from November 17, 2021, November 10, 2021, respectively, to November 19, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-07908 FLA(RAOx). (rn)
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #19 served on 10/19/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 19 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, Pomona Courthouse South #16 filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Notice of Lodging, #17 Proposed Order Granting Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint served on 10/13/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof #9 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, Pomona Courthouse South filed by Plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. Motion set for hearing on 11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (hr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #14 served on 10/12/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Reminder Notice to Counsel (CV-14) re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project - optional html form, #8 served on 10/12/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Declaration (Motion related), #11 , Request for Judicial Notice #10 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof #9 served on 10/12/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Meagan S. Tom in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof #9 filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof #9 filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Tom, Meagan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate of Service #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. Incorrect case number at top of second page. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, re Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #4 , Errata #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 10/04/2021. (Tom, Meagan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tom, Meagan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, identifying U.S. Bancorp. (Tom, Meagan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Tom, Meagan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21PSCV00699 Receipt No: ACACDC-32093742 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft))(Tom, Meagan)
October 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, U.S. Bank National Association, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Elaine Chung Oliver. (filed in state court 8/26/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 9) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elaine Chung Oliver v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Chung Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?