KY Home & Garden, LLC v. AMI Ventures, Inc.
Plaintiff: KY Home & Garden, LLC
Defendant: AMI Ventures, Inc., Extremely Reliable, Dealtz.com, Virventures.com, SportsDealbox.com, Petocart.com, Toytooth.com, Shopshiphappy.com, Zabiva.com, Slickmedialequipment.com, Lightsdaddy.com, Selectfurniturestore.com, Ergodebooks.com, Ergodebooks, AMITCJ, Ergode, Zabiva, Ergode2016, AmiVentures 54, Fast Media, Carkart.com, Ergode.com, Virventures Inc., Steven Wang formerly doing business as SK Garden Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot, American Seechance, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot, Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot, LA Green Garden, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot, Does 2-50, Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., Hua Vong, Thuong Nguyen, Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE and Hydro City USA
3Rd Party Defendant: Tencent Holding, Inc. doing business as Tencent also known as WeChat, Ebay Inc, Name.com, Inc., WeChat, GoDaddy.com Inc, Big Valley Brokerage doing business as Big Valley Auction and Pinterest, Inc.
Interested Party: Pankaj Rathi
Case Number: 2:2021cv08002
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 107 DEFENDANT HAU VONG'S ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint #48 filed by Defendant Hua Vong.(iv)
January 24, 2022 Filing 106 STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Trial Schedule)(Leavitt, Brandon)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. As of this date, the parties have not filed their proposed pretrial and trial schedule. The parties are again ORDERED to meet and confer, and complete the worksheet; as indicated at the hearing, the Court's preference is for the parties to agree on dates and submit one proposal. Plaintiff shall file a Joint Status Report with the completed worksheet no later than JANUARY 24, 2022. (iv)
December 19, 2021 Filing 104 ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, #48 filed by DEFENDANT American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc..(Wang, Jing)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: SELF-REPRESENTATION AND STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 8, 2021 Filing 102 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court confers with counsel and Ms. Vong. The parties are ordered to select a trial date. The Court will issue a further order as well as the scheduling conference worksheet. You may submit different proposals, but the preference of the Court is submit one proposal, which means agreeing on the trial date. The worksheet will walk the parties through the dates. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
November 4, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #99 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This Court set a Telephonic Conference for November 8, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following dial-in information: Number: (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 6448503. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2021 Filing 99 ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,, #48 filed by DEFENDANT American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc..(Wang, Jing)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #96 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
October 29, 2021 Filing 95 STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Leavitt, Brandon)
October 28, 2021 Filing 96 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendant Hua Vong. (lom)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #91 #93 Non-Resident Attorney Brandon J. Leavitt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of KY Home & Garden, LLC, designating Jason Kelly Smith as local counsel. (lom)
October 18, 2021 Filing 93 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandon J. Leavitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/15/2021, Receipt No. 32156374) filed by Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Jason)
October 15, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandon J. Leavitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32156374) #91 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
October 15, 2021 Filing 91 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brandon J. Leavitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32156374) filed by Plaintiff KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attorney Jason Kelly Smith added to party KY Home & Garden, LLC(pty:pla)) (Smith, Jason)
October 13, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Omar Darwich. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 13, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brandon James Leavitt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 13, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 13, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil)
October 13, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 4:20-cv-03382, from USDC Southern District of Texas, Houston. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21- cv-08002 MWF (MARx). (jtil)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. As the parties are aware, this matter was recently transferred from the Southern District of Texas and assigned to this Court. A brief review of the docket report reveals that a number of defendants have not appeared, others have been terminated, there are Third Party Defendants (but no Third Party Plaintiff is identified on the docket report), and one Interested Party is appearing pro se (without an address on the docket report). The Court now ORDERS the parties to meet and confer, and file a comprehensive Joint Status Report that includes the status of all parties, any pending motions or other requests, and a statement of the parties' proposal to move this case forward. Plaintiff shall be responsible for filing the Joint Status Report no later than October 29, 2021. The Court sets a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on November 8, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will docket the call-in information for the Status Conference on or before November 5, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2021 Filing 84 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Southern
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Central District of California; Granting in part and Denying in part #52 Hydro Planet Defendants motion to either dismiss. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying as moot #46 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice #56 Amended Motion.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Central District of California Eastern Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 9/30/2021, filed. (jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 81 Subpoena Issued as to Ebay Inc, GoDaddy.com, Inc, Name.com, Inc., Pinterest, Inc., Tencent Holding, Inc.. Issued subpoena returned to plaintiff by: CM/ECF Electronic Service, filed.(jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 80 Request for Issuance of Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number 0541-27070114.) filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AO 88B Form to Big Valley, #2 Exhibit AO 88B Form to eBay, #3 Exhibit AO 88B Form to GoDaddy, #4 Exhibit AO 88B Form to Name, #5 Exhibit AO 88B Form to Pinterest, #6 Exhibit AO 88B Form to Tencent)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Omar Darwich to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION for Omar Darwich to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AMI Ventures, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2021. (gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 77 RESPONSE to #75 MOTION for Default Judgment against AMI Ventures, Inc., filed by AMI Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(thanniable, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION for Default Judgment against AMI Ventures, Inc. by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Kim Yang (Exhibit A), #3 Exhibit B - USPTO File Wrapper 4536072, #4 Exhibit C - Infringement Evidence, #5 Exhibit D - Reputation Evidence, #6 Exhibit E - Infringement Notices, #7 Exhibit F - Correspondence Excerpts, #8 Affidavit of Brandon Leavitt (Exhibit G), #9 Exhibit H - Costs)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 6/9/2021. KY Home & Garden will file a motion for default judgment by 6/11/2021. Responses are due within 21 days and reply is within 7 days of response. Appearances:Pankaj Rathi, Hua Vong, Brandon James Leavitt.(Court Reporter: Malone), filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Setting re: #73 Opposed MOTION for pre-motion conference Hearing. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 10:45 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (gclairadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 73 Opposed MOTION for pre-motion conference Hearing by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2021. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Inability to Hire Attorney by Pankaj Rathi, filed. (sguevara, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 71 REPLY in Support of #64 MOTION to Amend #48 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, MOTION to Add Party Hua Vong, dba Garden Hydro; Thuong Nguyen, dba Super Deal Hydroponic and dba T&T Hydroponic; Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE dba Piffert, Inc. and dba Desert Cart and dba Orion Limited; Hydro City USA, filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 70 OBJECTIONS to #64 MOTION to Amend #48 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, MOTION to Add Party Hua Vong, dba Garden Hydro; Thuong Nguyen, dba Super Deal Hydroponic and dba T&T Hydroponic; Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE dba Piffert, Inc. and dba Desert Cart and dba Orion Limited; Hydro City USA , filed by American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc.. (Wang, Jing) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER to #64 MOTION to Amend #48 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, MOTION to Add Party Hua Vong, dba Garden Hydro; Thuong Nguyen, dba Super Deal Hydroponic and dba T&T Hydroponic; Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE dba Piffert, Inc. and dba Desert Cart and dba Orion Limited; Hydro City USA filed by Hua Vong. (agould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held on 4/7/2021 The Court held a pre-motion conference as stated on the record. Plaintiffs motions for entry of default and for default judgment [Dkt. 47, Dkt. 51, and Dkt. 53] are DENIED. Defendant AMI Ventures, Inc. will file a letter by the close of business on April 20, 2021 informing the Court whether it has obtained legal counsel. Any responses to Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend its complaint [Dkt. 64] are due by the close of business on April 20, 2021. Plaintiff may file a reply brief to each response within seven days of the date on which the response is filed. Plaintiff will confer with Hua Vong and get her contact information.Appearances: Jing Wang, Brandon James Leavitt.(Court Reporter: Sanchez), filed.(olindor, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Setting re: #63 Agreed REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 11:30 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (gclairadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 66 SEALED EXHIBITS C - Amazon Subpoena Response re: #64 MOTION to Amend #48 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, MOTION to Add Party Hua Vong, dba Garden Hydro; Thuong Nguyen, dba Super Deal Hydroponic and dba T&T Hydroponic; Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE dba Piffert, Inc. and dba Desert Cart and dba Orion Limited; Hydro City USA by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 65 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hua Vong, Thuong Nguyen, Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE, Hydro City USA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request re:Hua Vong, #2 Proposed Order Request re:Hydro City, #3 Proposed Order Request re:Desertcart, #4 Proposed Order Request re:Thuong Nguyen)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Amend #48 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, ( Motion Docket Date 4/9/2021.), MOTION to Add Party Hua Vong, dba Garden Hydro; Thuong Nguyen, dba Super Deal Hydroponic and dba T&T Hydroponic; Lys Hydro Garden, LLC, Desertcart Trading FZE dba Piffert, Inc. and dba Desert Cart and dba Orion Limited; Hydro City USA by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4th Amended Complaint (redline copy), #2 Complaint 4th Amended Complaint (clean version), #3 Exhibit 4th Amended Complaint - Exhibit A (email correspondence)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 63 Agreed REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 62 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD re: #36 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #59 Notice of Dismissal (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 60 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD re: #17 Order, filed. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc. by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 58 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD re: #38 Order, filed. Unable to locate updated address. (ChristopherSarrat, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 57 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD re: #25 Order on Motion to Substitute, filed. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 56 First AMENDED #46 MOTION by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - redline draft of edited motion, #3 Exhibit B - Infringement evidence, #4 Exhibit C - Subpoena Evidence)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to #52 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Prima Facie Jurisdictional Evidence)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Leavitt re: #51 MOTION for Entry of Default against American Seechance, Inc., Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., #53 First AMENDED #51 , #47 MOTION MOTION for Default Judgment against American Seechance, Inc., Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 53 First AMENDED #51 , #47 MOTION( Motion Docket Date 2/26/2021.), MOTION for Default Judgment against American Seechance, Inc., Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Infringement by Fei Fei Hydroponics, #3 Exhibit B - Infringement by Hydro Planet Entities, #4 Exhibit C - Party Correspondence, #5 Affidavit of Damages, #6 Exhibit E - USPTO File Wrapper 4536072, #7 Affidavit of Fees, #8 Exhibit G - Bill of Costs)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION for Entry of Default against American Seechance, Inc., Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, #3 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Supporting Affidavit)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 50 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Steven Wang re: #38 Order, filed. (jguajardo, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 49 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Steven Wang re: #36 Scheduling Order,,, filed. (dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss by American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2021. (wbostic, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 48 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AMI Ventures, Inc., American Seechance, Inc., AmiVentures 54, DOES 1-50, Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. Related document: #1 Claim filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC, #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC, #20 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined Draft of Amended Complaint)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Default Judgment against Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc. by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Exhibit List, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Fees, #4 Exhibit Bill of Costs, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Damages, #6 Exhibit USPTO File Wrapper 4536072, #7 Exhibit Party Correspondence)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Subpoena and Preservation of Evidence by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Infringement Evidence, #3 Exhibit Subpoena Evidence)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD served on 11/13/2020, answer due 2/11/2021, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 44 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to LA Green Garden, Inc. re: #25 Order on Motion to Substitute, filed. (ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 43 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Steven Wang re: #16 Notice of Setting/Resetting FORM - CV, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 42 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD re: #16 Notice of Setting/Resetting FORM - CV, filed. (gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Jing Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Jing Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (ltrevino, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2021: #1 Letter) (ltrevino, 3). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 39 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Steven Wang re: #17 Order, filed. (mmapps, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 REQUEST for pre-motion conference ( Answer due by 1/29/2021 )(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 2 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/29/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2021. Pltf Expert Report due by 10/1/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 10/29/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 10/29/2021. Discovery due by 11/24/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/1/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/11/2022. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 4/1/2022. Docket Call set for 4/8/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr. case is subject to being called to trial during May/June 2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #34 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (gclair, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 34 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on January 20, 2021. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances:Jiang Wang and Brandon James Leavitt. (Court Reporter: L. Wells), filed. (wbostic, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 37 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to LA Green Garden, Inc. re: #17 Order, filed. The address was updated and the Order was re-noticed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Granting #32 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Steven Wang. ORDERED that all claims asserted against Steven Wang in the above-captioned lawsuit are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their being re-filed...*** Steven Wang terminated. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Steven Wang by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 31 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brandon Leavitt)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AMI Ventures, Inc. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service (AMI Ventures))(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 29 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc. served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Brandon Leavitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice for KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Brandon Leavitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2021. (Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 31, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Steven Wang served on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Waiver of Service (Steven Wang))(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion for substituted service. Plaintiff is to file waivers and/or returns of service for all defendants by 2/1/21. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 24 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to American Seechance, Inc. re: #17 Order, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 23 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to American Seechance, Inc. re: #16 Notice of Setting/Resetting FORM - CV, filed. The address was updated and the Notice was re-noticed. (JosephWells, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CA Certificate of Formation)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc. filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Service by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Correspondence with AMI Ventures, #3 Exhibit Requests for waiver of service, #4 Exhibit Correspondence with Steven Wang)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Seechance, Inc. served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; LA Green Garden, Inc. served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to American Seechance, Inc., Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, LA Green Garden, Inc., Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., Steven Wang. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Steven Wang, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Seechance, Inc., filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc., filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to LA Green Garden, Inc., filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. Related document: #1 Claim filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by KY Home & Garden, LLC, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AMI Ventures, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued as to AMI Ventures, Inc. due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 CLAIM filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Leavitt, Brandon) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KY Home & Garden, LLC v. AMI Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tencent Holding, Inc. doing business as Tencent also known as WeChat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ebay Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Name.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WeChat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GoDaddy.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Big Valley Brokerage doing business as Big Valley Auction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Pinterest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KY Home & Garden, LLC
Represented By: Brandon James Leavitt
Represented By: Jason Kelly Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMI Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Omar Darwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extremely Reliable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealtz.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virventures.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SportsDealbox.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petocart.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toytooth.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopshiphappy.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zabiva.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slickmedialequipment.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightsdaddy.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectfurniturestore.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergodebooks.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergodebooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMITCJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zabiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergode2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmiVentures 54
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carkart.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergode.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virventures Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wang formerly doing business as SK Garden Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuzhou Seechance Holding, LTD doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot
Represented By: Jing Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Seechance, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot
Represented By: Jing Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Garden Supply & Manufacturing, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot
Represented By: Jing Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Green Garden, Inc. doing business as Hydro Planet doing business as Hydro Planet Depot
Represented By: Jing Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fei Fei Hydroponics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hua Vong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thuong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lys Hydro Garden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desertcart Trading FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydro City USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pankaj Rathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?