United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, CA
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located in Los Angeles, CA
Case Number: 2:2021cv08028
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 10/18/2021 and 10/19/2021 upon Defendant Real Property Located in Los Angeles, CA last date of publication 11/16/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyle, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cr-00579-SVW. Case transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08028-SVW (KSx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (aco)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff United States of America. Related Case(s): 2:21-cr-00579-SVW (Boyle, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Daniel G. Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel G. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located in Los Angeles, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?