Jack Eric Cline v. Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Eric Cline
Defendant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08176
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline.(Kim, Sam)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Standing Order filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Hering, Peter)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2021; Alta Hospitals System, LLC answer now due 11/19/2021; Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2021, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Southern California Healthcare System, Inc..(Hering, Peter)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Certification of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hering, Peter)
October 14, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 14, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car).
October 14, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline. Filed in State Court on 9/10/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car).
October 14, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Alta Hospitals System, LLC served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car).
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE of Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. (Hering, Peter)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. identifying Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hering, Peter)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Janine Yoshida re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Hering, Peter)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Hering, Peter)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV33420 Receipt No: ACACDC-32151465 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Supplement Certificate of Service) (Attorney Peter Hering added to party Alta Hospitals System, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Hering added to party Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Hering added to party Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hering, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack Eric Cline v. Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Eric Cline
Represented By: Sam K Kim
Represented By: Yoonis J Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Hering
Represented By: Maria Z Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Hospitals System, LLC
Represented By: Peter Hering
Represented By: Maria Z Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Hering
Represented By: Maria Z Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?