Scale Video Coding LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scale Video Coding LLC
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv08183
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: John A Kronstadt
3 Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DKT. 21) approved by Judge John A. Kronstadt re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #21 . The deadline of defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is continued to 1/21/2022. (mrgo)
November 29, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Timothy Chen Saulsbury added to party Zoom Video Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Saulsbury, Timothy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, upon Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren-Authorized to Accept on behalf of registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, designating Jeffrey F Craft as local counsel. (jp)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-08156 JAK (MAAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08183 JAK (MAAx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (esa)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32185201) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed.. (lt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32185201) filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (ghap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jacqueline Chooljian. New Case Number 2:21-cv-8183 RSWL(JCx). (ghap)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice (Other) #5 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-01699 2:21-cv-8156 8:21-cv-01700 8:21-cv-01701 8:21-cv-01702 8:21-cv-01704 (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC identifying Equitable IP Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, identifying Equitable IP Corporation. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32146398 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Jeffrey Francis Craft added to party Scale Video Coding LLC(pty:pla))(Craft, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scale Video Coding LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scale Video Coding LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jaewon Lee
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?