WRPV XIV Olive LA, LLC v. Hyunsung Yang et al
Plaintiff: WRPV XIV Olive LA, LLC
Defendant: Hyunsung Yang and Does 1 to 10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv08186
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1443 (1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STUD01419, acknowledged on 10/28/2021. (iv)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Hyunsung Yang re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #5 . (lom)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REMANDING ACTION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case Number 21STUD01419, forthwith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #3 is DENIED as moot. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to state court. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Reason: The Court lacks jurisdiction over this unlawful detainer action. (gk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Hyunsung Yang. (car)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant WRPV XIV Olive LA, LLC (car)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 21STUD01419 with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, filed by Defendant Hyunsung Yang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRPV XIV Olive LA, LLC v. Hyunsung Yang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRPV XIV Olive LA, LLC
Represented By: Chris J Evans
Represented By: Melissa Maria Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyunsung Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?