Floyd Dewaine Scott v. R.C. Johnson
Plaintiff: Floyd Dewaine Scott
Defendant: R. C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv08309
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency. On 10/18/2021, the Court received, through the United States Mail, a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. Submission of this complaint by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02. To submit a complaint arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983 to the Court for filing, you must present it to designated LAC staff for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your complaint a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. You must now re-submit your complaint to the Court electronically. You must submit for scanning an exact copy of the complaint you previously mailed to the Court; it cannot be modified in any way. You must include this notice on top of the complaint submitted for scanning. If your complaint is received in the Court's electronic mail box within two weeks from the date of this letter, your complaint will be deemed filed as of the date that appears on the envelope you originally sent via U.S. Mail. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lh)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (lh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed as Petitioner's Motion for writ of Mandate to Vacate Conviction for U.S. Constitutional Violations against DefendantR. C. Johnson pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato., filed by Plaintiff Floyd Dewaine Scott. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd Dewaine Scott v. R.C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Dewaine Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?