Gabriel Dorsey v. Vurgec Route 66, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Dorsey
Defendant: Vurgec Route 66, LLC and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv08352
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Dorseyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, Disabled Persons Act claim, California Health and Safety Code claim, and negligence claim. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 11/4/2021. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, Disabled Persons Act claim, California Health and Safety Code claim, and negligence claim and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Vurgec Route 66, LLC. (et)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Gabriel Dorsey. (Kim, Jason)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Dorsey. (Kim, Jason)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32194006 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Gabriel Dorsey(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel Dorsey v. Vurgec Route 66, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Dorsey
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vurgec Route 66, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?