General Scientific Corporation v. Den-Mat Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: General Scientific Corporation doing business as SurgiTel
Defendant: Den-Mat Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv08418
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Egan on behalf of Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James L. Higgins on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melanie K. Sharp on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 25 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:21-cv-00882-CFC, from USDC District of Delaware (Wilmington). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-08418-DMG (ASx). (et)
October 26, 2021 Filing 22 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Brian P. Egan regarding clarification on case transfer - re #20 Order on Motion to Transfer Case. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2021. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2021. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Melanie K. Sharp regarding Request for Oral Argument on Defendant Den-Mat Holdings, LLC's Motion to Transfer - re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division. (Sharp, Melanie) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 Answering Brief in Opposition [of Dr. Byung J. Chang in Support of Surgitel's Opposition to Den-Mat's Motion to Transfer Venue] by General Scientific Corporation. (Sharp, Melanie) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 Answering Brief in Opposition [of Scott D. Barnett in Support of Surgitel's Opposition to Den-Mat's Motion to Transfer Venue] by General Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Sharp, Melanie) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division filed by General Scientific Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/3/2021. (Sharp, Melanie) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CP Dental LLC for Den-Mat Holdings, LLC filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division -- Declaration of Todd Tiberi -- by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exs. 1-4)(Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division -- Declaration of David Casper -- by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division - filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2021. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Central District of California - Western Division - filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd J. Tiberi for Den-Mat Holdings, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd J. Tiberi filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/7/2021. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd J. Tiberi - filed by Den-Mat Holdings, LLC. (Egan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Michael Huget and Scott D. Barnett filed by General Scientific Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/24/2021. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by General Scientific Corporation. Den-Mat Holdings, LLC served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Sharp, Melanie) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney J. Michael Huget and Scott D. Barnett - filed by General Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification By Counsel to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by General Scientific Corporation. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,047,684 ;8,662,709. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Den-Mat Holdings, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3639773.) - filed by General Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mal). [Transferred from Delaware on 10/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Scientific Corporation v. Den-Mat Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Scientific Corporation doing business as SurgiTel
Represented By: Melanie K. Sharp
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Den-Mat Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Represented By: Todd J. Tiberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?