Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. Vizio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies Inc
Defendant: Vizio Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv08534
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Ricketts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Vizio Inc and designating Rex Hwang as local counsel #33 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
December 20, 2021 Filing 59 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ex Parte Reexamination and Inter Partes Review #52 filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Seigel)(Seigel, Steven)
December 20, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Defendant filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Declaration of Steve Seigel, #3 Proposed Order)(Seigel, Steven)
December 20, 2021 Filing 57 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Compel Answers to Interrogatories #55 , Notice (Other) #54 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #56 by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The document is stricken. (san)
December 20, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Compel Answers to Interrogatories #55 , Notice (Other) #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings- DISCOVERY Motions. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Contact Help Desk at 213-894-0242 for e-filing assistance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (san)
December 17, 2021 Filing 55 **STRICKEN** Joint STIPULATION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Vizio, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Seigel)(Seigel, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2021 (san).
December 17, 2021 Filing 54 **STRICKEN** NOTICE of Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Seigel, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2021 (san).
December 16, 2021 Filing 53 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Ricketts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Vizio Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32494047) filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hwang, Rex)
December 8, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ex Parte Reexamination and Inter Partes Review filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Rex Hwang, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15) (Hwang, Rex)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 19, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Vizio Inc.(Hwang, Rex)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. and designating Oleg Elkhunovich, as local counsel #46 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: (lc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
November 15, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
November 12, 2021 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32319650) filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. and designating Oleg Elkhunovich, as local counsel #44 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 44 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/9/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-32296764) filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 9, 2021 Filing 43 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32296764) #41 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by November 12, 2021. (smo)
November 9, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32296764) #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
November 9, 2021 Filing 41 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32296764) filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 8, 2021 Filing 40 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vizio Inc answer now due 11/19/2021, filed by Defendant Vizio Inc.(Hwang, Rex)
November 8, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Vizio Incto Notice of Related Case(s) #33 (Hwang, Rex)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Skiermont to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Vizio Inc. and designating Rex Hwang as local counsel #36 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vizio Inc, identifying Corporate Parent VIZIO Holding Corp.. (Hwang, Rex)
November 5, 2021 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Skiermont to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Vizio Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32285075) filed by Defendant Vizio Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hwang, Rex)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rex Hwang on behalf of Defendant Vizio Inc (Hwang, Rex)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra G. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc and designating Oleg Elkhunovich, as local counsel #32 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi (lc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. Related Case(s): SACV 19-2192-GW-ADSx (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexandra G. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32268027) filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oleg Elkhunovich counsel for Plaintiff Ancora Technologies Inc. Adding Oleg Elkhunovich as counsel of record for Ancora Technologies, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attorney Oleg Elkhunovich added to party Ancora Technologies Inc(pty:pla))(Elkhunovich, Oleg)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Joseph Skiermont. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andres Healy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Seigel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lexie G. White. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles L. Ainsworth. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
November 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 6:21-cv-00739, from USDC Western District of Texas. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21- cv-08534 MCS (JEMx). (jtil)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Western
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Transfer Case. The Court further ORDERS that Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer for Improper Venue (D.I. 8) is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerks Office shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California for all further proceedings. After transfer, the Clerk shall close the case in the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case and Deny as Moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Transfer)(Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #16 Stipulation. Please resubmit this joint stipulation in the form of a Motion. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Transfer and Deny as Moot, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Transfer, etc.)(Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT re Case Readiness by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to Proceed with Venue Discovery by Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Seigel, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M. Seigel on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Steven M. Seigel added to party Ancora Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Seigel, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex Hwang on behalf of Vizio, Inc. (Hwang, Rex) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph Skiermont on behalf of Vizio, Inc.. Attorney Paul Joseph Skiermont added to party Vizio, Inc.(pty:dft) (Skiermont, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vizio, Inc.. (Hwang, Rex) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss , Or, Alternatively, Transfer for Improper Venue by Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wilda Siu, #2 Declaration of Rex Hwang, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Hwang, Rex) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Vizio, Inc. answer due 9/8/2021. (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant VIZIO, Inc. to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. After considering the same, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion should be GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant VIZIO, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended up to and including September 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint)(Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. Vizio, Inc. served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vizio, Inc. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15023479), filed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Healy, Andres) [Transferred from Texas Western on 11/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. Vizio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies Inc
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Lexie G. White
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Steven M. Seigel
Represented By: Alexandra G. White
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Andres Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio Inc
Represented By: Paul J Skiermont
Represented By: Rex Hwang
Represented By: Michael D. Ricketts
Represented By: Paul J. Skiermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?